Louisiana Western District Court
Judge:David C Joseph
Referred: David J Ayo
Case #: 6:25-cv-00545
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Case Filed:Apr 24, 2025
Case in other court:15th Judicial District Court, C-20251646
Last checked: Thursday Apr 24, 2025 5:05 PM CDT
Defendant
Rope Transport Inc
Defendant
Babak Tadayon
Represented By
Murphy J Burke, III
Litchfield Cavo (man)
contact info
Plaintiff
Trosclair Magee


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
10 10 misc Response to Removal Order Wed 04/30 3:28 PM
RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by Babak Tadayon .(aty,Burke, Murphy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit List of Parties, Pleadings,
Att: 2 Exhibit State Court Record
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 04/29 5:34 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Babak Tadayon.(aty,Burke, Murphy)
Related: [-]
8 8 order Removal Order Tue 04/29 1:00 PM
REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J Ayo on 4/29/2025. (crt,Chicola, C)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
7 7 misc Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement Mon 04/28 12:13 PM
DIVERSITY JURISDICTION DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Babak Tadayon. (aty,Burke, Murphy)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Proposed Order (Court User Only/Public Entry No NEF) Mon 04/28 10:01 AM
PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge David J Ayo. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 4/28/2025. (crt,Thomas, T)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement Requirement (Form Included) Mon 04/28 9:54 AM
NOTICE of Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement Requirement re:1 Notice of Removal, sent to Murphy J Burke, III on behalf of Babak Tadayon, Rope Transport Inc; AND Anne Marie Polk Muller-McCrary on behalf of Trosclair Magee. Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement due by 5/12/2025. (crt,Thomas, T)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice (Other) Mon 04/28 9:44 AM
NOTICE of Filing State Court Record by Babak Tadayon re1 Notice of Removal,(aty,Burke, Murphy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit State Court Pleadings
Thursday, April 24, 2025
3 3 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 04/24 4:00 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Babak Tadayon,Rope Transport Inc. (aty,Burke, Murphy) Modified to add filer on 4/24/2025 (Thomas, T)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Thu 04/24 3:53 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET by Babak Tadayon. (aty,Burke, Murphy)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Thu 04/24 3:47 PM
NOTICE of Removal from 15th JDC Lafayette Parish, Case Number C-20251646 with Jury Demand; (Filing fee $405, receipt number ALAWDC-6253828) filed by Babak Tadayon.(Attorney Murphy J Burke, III added to party Babak Tadayon(pty:dft))(aty,Burke, Murphy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Petition
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 04/28 9:59 AM
CASE Assigned to Judge David C Joseph and Magistrate Judge David J Ayo. (crt,Thomas, T)
Related: [-]