Missouri Western District Court
Judge:Willie J Epps, Jr
Case #: 2:25-cv-04078
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Case Filed:Apr 24, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Apr 24, 2025 5:06 PM CDT
Defendant
Gary Barclay
Defendant
Seth Barclay
Defendant
Midstate Communication Contractors, Inc.
Defendant
Windstream Communications, Inc.
Plaintiff
The Southern Bank Company
Represented By
Danne Wayne Webb
Horn, Aylward & Bandy, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/18/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
9 9 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 05/14 11:19 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Gary Barclay, Seth Barclay, Midstate Communication Contractors, Inc. filed by Andrea S. McMurtry on behalf of The Southern Bank Company.(McMurtry, Andrea)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7,
Att: 8 Exhibit 8
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 05/14 11:14 AM
NOTICE of appearance by Andrea S. McMurtry on behalf of The Southern Bank Company (Attorney Andrea S. McMurtry added to party The Southern Bank Company(pty:pla))(McMurtry, Andrea)
Related: [-]
service Summons Issued Wed 05/14 1:46 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Windstream Supply, LLC. Emailed to plaintiffs counsel for service. (CAB)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
7 7 service Return of Service of Complaint Executed Tue 05/13 12:25 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by The Southern Bank Company. Gary Barclay served on 5/2/2025, answer due 5/23/2025. (Webb, Danne)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Return of Service of Complaint Executed Tue 05/13 12:24 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by The Southern Bank Company. Seth Barclay served on 5/2/2025, answer due 5/23/2025. (Webb, Danne)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
5 5 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 05/01 1:24 PM
ORDER granting4 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Hal Emalfarb for The Southern Bank Company allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at [LINK:PACER] . This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Warren, Melissa)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 05/01 9:31 AM
Motion to allow Hal Emalfarb to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-9558103) filed by Danne Wayne Webb on behalf of The Southern Bank Company. (Webb, Danne)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
3 3 order Notice of Pretrial Procedure Fri 04/25 9:34 AM
ORDER ON PRETRIAL PROCEDURES. Service must be obtained on all defendants within forty (40) days of the date of this Order unless otherwise authorized by the Court. Signed on 4/25/2025 by Chief Magistrate Judge Willie J. Epps, Jr. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (McIntosh, Michal-Ane)
Related: [-]
service Summons Issued Fri 04/25 2:50 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Gary Barclay, Seth Barclay, Midstate Communication Contractors, Inc. and Windstream Communications, Inc. Emailed to plaintiffs counsel for service. (Berner, Crystal)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
2 2 notice Notice of MAPADMIN Thu 04/24 2:44 PM
NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS. Notice of MAP assignment to Program Director. (Berner, Crystal)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 MAP General Order
1 1 14 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 04/24 2:20 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Danne Wayne Webb on behalf of the southern bank company. Filing fee $405, receipt number AMOWDC-9548280. Service due by 7/23/2025 unless otherwise directed by the court.(Webb, Danne)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3,
Att: 5 Exhibit 4,
Att: 6 Exhibit 5,
Att: 7 Exhibit 6,
Att: 8 Exhibit 7,
Att: 9 Exhibit 8
notice Notice of Magistrate Judge Assignment Thu 04/24 2:45 PM
NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge assignment. Click[LINK:here] for instructions. Form due by 5/15/2025 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Berner, Crystal)
Related: [-]