Nebraska District Court
Judge:Robert F Rossiter, Jr
Referred: Michael D Nelson
Case #: 8:25-cv-00308
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Apr 24, 2025
Case in other court:District Court of Douglas County, Nebraska, CI 25-02483
Last checked: Thursday Apr 24, 2025 5:07 PM CDT
Defendant
Integrated Builders, Inc.
Defendant
Menard, Inc.
Represented By
Spencer W. Werth
Fraser, Stryker Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
Gary Michael Westwood
Represented By
Jennifer L. Turco Meyer
Turco, Meyer Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
5 5 oth_ans Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Wed 04/30 10:50 AM
ANSWER to Notice of Removal Complaint regarding: Notice of Removal Attorney - Complaint1 by Menard, Inc. (Werth, Spencer)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
4 4 oth_doc Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 Mon 04/28 12:00 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Spencer W. Werth on behalf of Defendant Menard, Inc..(Werth, Spencer)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
3 3 notice Notice Regarding Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 04/25 8:44 AM
TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Menard, Inc. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(RMR)
Related: [-]
2 2 oth_evt Assignment of Judges Fri 04/25 8:43 AM
TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Chief Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (RMR)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
1 1 4 pgs cmp Notice of Removal Thu 04/24 4:03 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand against All Parties from District Court of Douglas County, Case number CI 25-2483 with attached state court pleadingsMenard, Inc.(Werth, Spencer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Original Complaint