New York Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Elizabeth S Stong
Case #: 1:25-bk-41997
Case Filed:Apr 24, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$100,001 to $500,000
Est. Liabilities $100,001 to $500,000
Nature of Business Single Asset Real Estate
Nature of Debts Primarily Business
Small BusinessYes

Debtor
Home Werks LLC
3606 215th St
Bayside, NY 11361-2126
Represented By
Home Werks LLC
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee
Eastern District of NY (Brooklyn) Alexander Hamilton Custom House One Bowling Green Room 510
New York, NY 10004


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Sunday, April 27, 2025
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice/Order Mon 04/28 12:08 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice/Order Notice Date 04/27/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Deficient Filing Mon 04/28 12:08 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Deficient Filing Notice Date 04/27/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
6 6 court BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Hearing on Defective or Deficient Filing Ch. 11 Mon 04/28 12:08 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Hearing on Defective or Deficient Filing - Chapter 11 Non-Individual Notice Date 04/27/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
5 5 trustee Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 - US Trustee Fri 04/25 3:49 PM
Meeting of Creditors Filed by Office of the United States Trustee. 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/30/2025 at 01:30 PM at Telephonic Meeting: Phone 1 (877) 929-2553, Participant Code 1576337, Enter # sign. (Khodorovsky, Nazar)
Related: [-]
4 4 court Notice of Hearing of Defective or Deficient Filing of Non-Individual Chapter 11 Case Fri 04/25 2:22 PM
Notice of Hearing on Deficient Chapter 11 Case for Debtor's Failure to be Represented by Counsel.Hearing scheduled for 6/20/2025 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom 3585 (Judge Stong), Brooklyn, NY. . Chapter 11 Non-Individual Attorney Cure due by 5/9/2025. Related [+] (las)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Home Werks LLC
3 3 order Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference (Ch 11) All Judges Fri 04/25 1:57 PM
Order Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference. Signed on 4/25/2025. Status hearing to be held on 6/20/2025 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom 3585 (Judge Stong), Brooklyn, NY. (drk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
2 2 court Deficient Filing Chapter 11 Fri 04/25 1:26 PM
Deficient Filing Chapter 11 Filing fee for commencing a bankruptcy case pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1930a due by 4/24/2025.Affidavit Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1007-4 due 4/24/2025. 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors due 4/24/2025. Corporate Resolution Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1074-1(a) due by 4/24/2025. Corporate Ownership Statement Pursuant to FBR 1007(a)(1) due 4/24/2025. Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to FBR 1073-3 due 4/24/2025. Small Business Balance Sheet due by 5/1/2025. Small Business Cash Flow Statement due by 5/1/2025. Small Business Statement of Operations due by 5/1/2025. Small Business Tax Return due by 5/1/2025. Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individuals Official Form 206Sum due by 5/8/2025. Schedule A/B due 5/8/2025. Schedule D due 5/8/2025. Schedule E/F due 5/8/2025. Schedule G due 5/8/2025. Schedule H due 5/8/2025. Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non Individual Debtors Official Form 202 due 5/8/2025. List of Equity Security Holders due 5/8/2025. Statement of Financial Affairs Non-Ind Form 207 due 5/8/2025. Incomplete Filings due by 5/8/2025. (las)
Related: [-]
1 1 10 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Thu 04/24 3:49 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Small Business Non-Individual. Fee Amount $ 1738. Filed by Home Werks LLC Chapter 11 Plan - Small Business - due by 10/21/2025. Chapter 11 Small Business Disclosure Statement due by 10/21/2025. (las)
Related: [-]
court Prior Filings Thu 04/24 3:53 PM
[LINK:Prior Filing] Case Number(s): 1 20-40686 cec dismissed 03/30/2020 (las)
Related: [-]