New York Southern District Court
Judge:Lewis J Liman
Case #: 1:25-cv-03375
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332jd Diversity-Declaratory Judgement
Case Filed:Apr 23, 2025
Last checked: Friday Apr 25, 2025 4:14 AM EDT
Defendant
American Automobile Insurance Company
Defendant
David Chen
Defendant
Christine Sperry
Defendant
Eyal Hen
Defendant
Fireman's Fund Insurance Company
Defendant
Fontana Realty LLC
Defendant
Friends of Petrosino Square
Defendant
Georgette Fleisher
Defendant
John Ilibassi
Defendant
Marna Lawrence
Defendant
Paul Hallasy
Defendant
Soho Hummus, LLC
Plaintiff
Norguard Insurance Company
Represented By
Lee Scott Siegel
Hurwitz Fine P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, April 24, 2025
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Thu 04/24 11:38 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Cathy Seibel. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Thu 04/24 11:38 AM
Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Thu 04/24 11:38 AM
Case Designated ECF. (pc)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction Thu 04/24 11:38 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Lee Scott Siegel. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Citizenship Plaintiff code 2 (Citizen of Another State); Citizenship Defendant code 1 (Citizen of This State); Dollar Demand $75,000; County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Citizenship Plaintiff code has been modified to 5 (Incorporated/Principal Place of Business-Other State); the Citizenship Defendant code has been modified to 4 (Incorporated/Principal Place of Business-This State); the Dollar Demand has been modified to blank; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (pc)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Civil Cover Sheet Thu 04/24 11:38 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Lee Scott Siegel to RE-FILE Document No. 2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): incorrect citizenship for the plaintiff and defendant were selected;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. (pc)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Request for Issuance of Summons Thu 04/24 11:38 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Lee Scott Siegel to RE-FILE Document No. 3 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; attorney info is blank;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification Thu 04/24 11:39 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Lee Scott Siegel. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: MARNA LAWRENCE, SOHO HUMMUS, LLC d/b/a 19 CLEVELAND BY NISH NUSH, CHRISTINE SPERRY, GEORGETTE FLEISHER, FRIENDS OF PETROSINO SQUARE. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; alias party name was omitted;. (pc)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment Thu 04/24 4:50 PM
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Lewis J. Liman. Judge Cathy Seibel is no longer assigned to the case..(tro)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Redesignation to Magistrate Judge Thu 04/24 4:51 PM
NOTICE OF REDESIGNATION TO ANOTHER MAGISTRATE JUDGE. The above entitled action has been redesignated to Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Please note that this is a reassignment of the designation only. (tro)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
3 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to SOHO HUMMUS, LLC, d/b/a 19 CLEVELAND BY NISH NUSH; EYAL HEN; FONTANA REALTY LLC; JOHN ILIBASSI; DAVID CHEN; FRIENDS OF PETROSINO SQUARE; GEORGETTE FLEISHER; CHRISTINE SPERRY; MARNA LAWRENCE; PAUL HALLASY; FIREMAN'S FUND INSURANCE COMPANY; AMERICAN AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Norguard Insurance Company..(Siegel, Lee) Modified on 4/24/2025 (pc).
Related: [-]
2 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Siegel, Lee) Modified on 4/24/2025 (pc).
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against American Automobile Insurance Company, David Chen, GEORGETTE FLEISHER, FRIENDS OF PETROSINO SQUARE, Fireman's Fund Insurance Company, Fontana Realty LLC, PAUL HALLASY, EYAL HEN, John Ilibassi, MARNA LAWRENCE, SOHO HUMMUS, LLC d/b/a 19 CLEVELAND BY NISH NUSH, CHRISTINE SPERRY. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-30975878)Document filed by Norguard Insurance Company..(Siegel, Lee)
Related: [-]