New York Southern District Court
Judge:Jennifer H Rearden
Case #: 1:25-cv-03400
Nature of Suit540 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Mandamus & Other
Cause28:1651cn Petition for Writ of Coram Nobis
Case Filed:Apr 17, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
4 4 1 pgs order Order to Answer Tue 04/29 4:53 PM
ORDER TO ANSWER: The Court, having concluded that the present pro se petition for a writ of error coram nobis should not be summarily denied as without merit, hereby ORDERS that: The Clerk of Court shall electronically notify the Criminal Division of the United States Attorneys Office for the Southern District of New York that this Order has been issued. Within 60 days of the date of this Order, the United States Attorneys Office shall file a response to the petition. Petitioner shall have 30 days from the date on which he is served with the Government's response to file a reply. Absent further order, the petition will be considered fully submitted as of that date. All papers filed or submitted for filing must include the criminal docket number and will be docketed in the criminal action. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jennifer H. Rearden on 4/29/2025) (jca)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
misc Mailing Receipt Fri 04/25 12:01 PM
MAILING RECEIPT: Document No: 2. Mailed to: Eduardo H. JimenezPerez 256 Columbia Ave. 2nd Floor Lodi, NJ 07644. (vba)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
2 2 order Standing Order re Cases Filed By Pro Se Plaintiffs Thu 04/24 2:48 PM
STANDING ORDER IN RE CASES FILED BY PRO SE PLAINTIFFS (See 24-MISC-127 Standing Order filed March 18, 2024). To ensure that all cases heard in the Southern District of New York are handled promptly and efficiently, all parties must keep the court apprised of any new contact information. It is a party's obligation to provide an address for service; service of court orders cannot be accomplished if a party does not update the court when a change of address occurs. Accordingly, all self-represented litigants are hereby ORDERED to inform the court of each change in their address or electronic contact information. Parties may[LINK:consent to electronic service] to receive notifications of court filings by email, rather than relying on regular mail delivery. Parties may also ask the court for[LINK:permission to file documents electronically] . Forms, including instructions for consenting to electronic service and requesting permission to file documents electronically, may be found by clicking on the hyperlinks in this order, or by accessing the forms on the courts website, nysd.uscourts.gov/forms. The procedures that follow apply only to cases filed by pro se plaintiffs. If the court receives notice from the United States Postal Service that an order has been returned to the court, or otherwise receives information that the address of record for a self-represented plaintiff is no longer valid, the court may issue an Order to Show Cause why the case should not be dismissed without prejudice for failure to comply with this order. Such order will be sent to the plaintiffs last known address and will also be viewable on the court's electronic docket. A notice directing the parties' attention to this order shall be docketed (and mailed to any self-represented party that has appeared and has not consented to electronic service) upon the opening of each case or miscellaneous matter that is classified as pro se in the court's records. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 03/18/2024) (sac)
Related: [-]
service Note Regarding Service on Self-Represented Party Thu 04/24 2:48 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT NOTE: For each electronic filing made in a case involving a self-represented party who has not consented to electronic service, the filing party must serve the document on such self-represented party in a manner permitted by Fed. R. Civ. P. 5(b)(2) (other than through the ECF system) and file proof of service for each document so served. Please see[LINK:Rule 9.2] of the courts ECF Rules & Instructions for further information. (sac)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
1 1 51 pgs cmp Complaint/Petition in the Nature of Mandamus Thu 04/24 2:43 PM
PETITION FOR WRIT OF ERROR CORAM NOBIS against United States of America. Document filed by Eduardo H. Jimenez Perez. (sac)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Thu 04/24 2:43 PM
Case Designated ECF. (sac)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Thu 04/24 2:44 PM
Magistrate Judge Jennifer Willis is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (sac)
Related: [-]
utility Case Accepted as Related Thu 04/24 2:46 PM
CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:09-cr-00159-JHR. (sac)
Related: [-]