New York Southern District Court
Judge:Naomi Reice Buchwald
Case #: 1:25-cv-03418
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity Action
Case Filed:Apr 24, 2025
Last checked: Friday Apr 25, 2025 3:05 AM EDT
Defendant
Scott Beute
Defendant
Brad Bush
Defendant
Gerald Halford
Defendant
Tim McIllwain
Defendant
Mitch Veldheer
Plaintiff
J.R. Automation Technologies, LLC
Represented By
Tod Scott Chasin
Riker Danzig
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 04/30 11:36 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Scott A. Ohnegian on behalf of J.R. Automation Technologies, LLC..(Ohnegian, Scott)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
14 14 service Summons Issued Mon 04/28 4:00 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Tim McIllwain..(pc)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
13 13 2 pgs service Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 04/25 3:17 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Tim McIllwain, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by J.R. Automation Technologies, LLC..(Chasin, Tod)
Related: [-]
12 12 2 pgs service Summons Issued Fri 04/25 12:09 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Scott Beute..(jgo)
Related: [-]
11 11 2 pgs service Summons Issued Fri 04/25 12:08 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Mitch Veldheer..(jgo)
Related: [-]
10 10 2 pgs service Summons Issued Fri 04/25 12:07 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Gerald Halford..(jgo)
Related: [-]
9 9 2 pgs service Summons Issued Fri 04/25 12:05 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Brad Bush..(jgo)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Fri 04/25 11:59 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(jgo)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Fri 04/25 12:01 PM
Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (jgo)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Fri 04/25 12:02 PM
Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction Fri 04/25 12:03 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Tod Scott Chasin. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (jgo)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification Fri 04/25 12:04 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Tod Scott Chasin. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: J.R. Automation Technologies, LLC. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (jgo)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 04/25 12:11 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Tod Scott Chasin to RE-FILE Document No. 3 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; party name listed on the PDF 'To' field does not match as it appears on the pleading caption;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
8 8 2 pgs misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 04/24 10:48 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Hitachi Industrial Holdings Americas, Inc. for J.R. Automation Technologies, LLC. Document filed by J.R. Automation Technologies, LLC..(Chasin, Tod)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Request for Issuance of Summons Thu 04/24 10:47 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Mitch Veldheer, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by J.R. Automation Technologies, LLC..(Chasin, Tod)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Request for Issuance of Summons Thu 04/24 10:46 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Brad Bush, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by J.R. Automation Technologies, LLC..(Chasin, Tod)
Related: [-]
5 5 2 pgs service Request for Issuance of Summons Thu 04/24 10:45 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Gerald Halford, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by J.R. Automation Technologies, LLC..(Chasin, Tod)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Request for Issuance of Summons Thu 04/24 10:44 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Scott Beute, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by J.R. Automation Technologies, LLC..(Chasin, Tod)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Thu 04/24 10:44 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Tim McIllwan, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by J.R. Automation Technologies, LLC..(Chasin, Tod)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Thu 04/24 10:43 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Chasin, Tod)
Related: [-]
1 1 12 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 04/24 10:42 PM
COMPLAINT against Scott Beute, Brad Bush, Gerald Halford, Tim McIllwain, Mitch Veldheer. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-30984107)Document filed by J.R. Automation Technologies, LLC..(Chasin, Tod)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 22 pgs Exhibit A,
Att: 2 22 pgs Exhibit B,
Att: 3 23 pgs Exhibit C,
Att: 4 23 pgs Exhibit D,
Att: 5 31 pgs Exhibit E