Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Thomas W Thrash, Jr
Case #: 1:25-cv-02226
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1446 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Case Filed:Apr 24, 2025
Last checked: Friday Apr 25, 2025 1:06 AM EDT
Defendant
ABC Corporation 1
Defendant
Costco Wholesale Corporation
Represented By
Shivam Kumar
Wicker Smith O'Hara Mccoy & Ford, P.A.
contact info
Joseph Menello
Wicker Smith O'Hara Mccoy & Ford P.A
contact info
Defendant
John Doe 1
Defendant
John Doe 2
Plaintiff
Renee Segan
Represented By
Michael Rene Braun
Law Office Of Michael R. Braun
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Monday, May 05, 2025
4 4 misc Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 05/05 2:02 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons by Renee Segan. (Braun, Michael)
Related: [-]
misc Clerk's Notation for LOA/CIP Mon 05/05 2:50 PM
Clerk's Notation re3 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement,4 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Reviewed and approved by Judge Thrash. (jeh)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
3 3 misc Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 05/02 11:05 AM
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Costco Wholesale Corporation. (Menello, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
2 2 answer Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Thu 04/24 9:49 AM
ANSWER to1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Costco Wholesale Corporation. Discovery ends on 9/22/2025. (Originally e-filed in Fulton County State Court on 2/21/2025)(djs)
Related: [-]
1 1 7 pgs cmp Notice of Removal Thu 04/24 9:47 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT. (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AGANDC-14244314) filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation.(djs)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet