Louisiana Western District Court
Judge:Terry A Doughty
Referred: Joseph H L Perez-Montes
Case #: 1:25-cv-00550
Nature of Suit530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General
Cause8:1105(a) Aliens: Habeas Corpus to Release INS Det
Case Filed:Apr 24, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
11 11 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 04/29 11:51 AM
MOTION for Gracie H. Willis to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-6257646) by V M L, Trish Mack. Motions referred to Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 4/29/2025.(aty,Vogel, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of good standing
10 10 3 pgs order Order Tue 04/29 9:36 AM
ORDER re evidence to be presented at 5/16/25 hearing. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 4/29/2025. (crt,Crawford, A)
Related: [-]
Saturday, April 26, 2025
9 9 order Jurisdictional Review Finding Sat 04/26 8:29 PM
ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1331. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H.L. Perez-Montes on 4/26/2025. (crt,Tice, Y)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
8 8 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Fri 04/25 3:58 PM
ORDER re2 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Trish Mack, V M L. Hearing set for 5/16/2025 at 9:00 AM in Monroe, Courtroom 1 before Judge Terry A Doughty. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 4/25/2025. (crt,Crawford, A)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons Issued - USA (Form Included) Fri 04/25 1:55 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to U S Attorney, U S Attorney General, Mellissa B Harper, Kenneth Genalo, Todd Lyons, Kristi Noem, Pamela Bondi. (crt,Devillier, W)
Related: [-]
6 6 respm Response to Motion Fri 04/25 11:25 AM
RESPONSE to Motion re2 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Mellissa B Harper, Kenneth Genalo, Todd Lyons, Kristi Noem, Pamela Bondi.(aty,McCarter, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Exhibit A -- Handwritten Letter of Jenny Lopez Villela,
Att: 2 Exhibit B -- Declaration of Mellissa Harper,
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
5 5 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 04/25 9:41 AM
REPLY to Response to Motion re2 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by V M L, Trish Mack.(aty,Vogel, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum / Brief Ex. 1 Gov't Opposition
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 04/25 9:39 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Bichngoc T Do on behalf of Mellissa B Harper, Kenneth Genalo, Todd Lyons, Kristi Noem, Pamela Bondi (Attorney Bichngoc T Do added to party Mellissa B Harper(pty:dft), Attorney Bichngoc T Do added to party Kenneth Genalo(pty:dft), Attorney Bichngoc T Do added to party Todd Lyons(pty:dft), Attorney Bichngoc T Do added to party Kristi Noem(pty:dft), Attorney Bichngoc T Do added to party Pamela Bondi(pty:dft)) (aty,Do, Bichngoc)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 04/25 9:19 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph McCarter on behalf of Mellissa B Harper, Kenneth Genalo, Todd Lyons, Kristi Noem, Pamela Bondi (Attorney Joseph McCarter added to party Mellissa B Harper(pty:dft), Attorney Joseph McCarter added to party Kenneth Genalo(pty:dft), Attorney Joseph McCarter added to party Todd Lyons(pty:dft), Attorney Joseph McCarter added to party Kristi Noem(pty:dft), Attorney Joseph McCarter added to party Pamela Bondi(pty:dft)) (aty,McCarter, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
2 2 motion Temporary Restraining Order Thu 04/24 8:01 PM
Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by V M L, Trish Mack. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 4/24/2025.(aty,Vogel, Matthew) Modified to edit text on 4/25/2025 (Devillier, W).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 12 pgs Memorandum / Brief In Support of Emergency TRO,
Att: 2 Proposed order
1 1 10 pgs cmp Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Thu 04/24 7:59 PM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $5, receipt number ALAWDC-6254044) filed by V M L, Trish Mack.(Attorney Matthew Scott Vogel added to party V M L (pty:pet), Attorney Matthew Scott Vogel added to party Trish Mack(pty:pet))(aty,Vogel, Matthew) Modified to edit text on 4/25/2025 (Devillier, W).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Birth Certificate,
Att: 2 4 pgs Exhibit Correspondence with Respondent Harper,
Att: 3 2 pgs Exhibit Provisional Custody by Mandate,
Att: 4 3 pgs Affidavit Affidavit of Next Friend,
Att: 5 Civil cover sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 04/25 8:14 AM
CASE Assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty and Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Devillier, W)
Related: [-]
utility Motions Transferred Fri 04/25 9:35 AM
Motions Transferred regarding2 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . Motions referred to Judge Terry A Doughty. (crt,Devillier, W)
Related: [-]