Nebraska District Court
Judge:Joseph F Bataillon
Referred: Jacqueline M Deluca
Case #: 8:25-cv-00311
Nature of Suit330 Torts - Personal Injury - Federal Employers’ Liability
Cause45:51 Railways: Fed. Employer's Liability Act
Case Filed:Apr 24, 2025
Last checked: Friday Apr 25, 2025 2:05 AM CDT
Defendant
Union Pacific Railroad Co.
1400 Douglas Street
Omaha, NE 68179
Plaintiff
David Fox
2326 Glen Circle
Salina, KS 67401
Represented By
Shawn M. Sassaman
Bern, Cappelli Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Friday, April 25, 2025
2 2 oth_evt Assignment of Judges Fri 04/25 10:43 AM
TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline M. DeLuca assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (JES)
Related: [-]
utility Remark - Public (Related Case) Fri 04/25 10:46 AM
Remark - Public Related [+]: This notice serves to advise the parties that a plaintiff noted this case as related to another pending or closed case in this court. If a case is noted as related on the cover sheet or case opening screen when filed, the clerk assigns it to the district judge who handled the earlier pending or closed case. See NEGenR 1.4(a)(4)(B). Any challenge to operation of this rule must be made pursuant to NEGenR 1.4(a)(7). (JES)
Related: [-] lated Case
Thursday, April 24, 2025
1 1 5 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 04/24 6:04 PM
COMPLAINT with jury demand against Union Pacific Railroad Co. ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ANEDC-5308323), by Attorney Shawn M. Sassaman on behalf of David Fox(Sassaman, Shawn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet