Wyoming Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Cathleen D Parker
Case #: 2:25-bk-20159
Case Filed:Apr 24, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business
Small BusinessYes

Debtor
WaterIQ Technologies, LLC
11 Worth Cir
Johnson City, TN 37601-4323
Represented By
Leah Callaghan Schwartz
Parsons Behle & Latimer
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
308 West 21st Street, 2nd Floor
Cheyenne, WY 82001


Docket last updated: 05/13/2025 1:01 PM MDT
Monday, May 12, 2025
75 75 1 pgs order Regarding Compliance With Rules Mon 05/12 3:01 PM
Order Requiring Compliance Related [+]. Compliance due by 5/19/2025. (tsm)
Related: [-] 5 Notice of Incomplete Filing
Friday, May 09, 2025
74 74 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Fri 05/09 10:25 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/09/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 67 Order Scheduling Hearing
Thursday, May 08, 2025
73 73 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Thu 05/08 10:25 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/08/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 65 Order on Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions
72 72 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Thu 05/08 10:25 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/08/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 64 Order on Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions
71 71 3 pgs court Corp/Ptnr Resolution Thu 05/08 2:39 PM
Corporation/Partnership Resolution Filed. Filed by WaterIQ Technologies, LLC (Neilson, Darren)
Related: [-]
70 70 2 pgs misc Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor Thu 05/08 2:35 PM
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor Related [+]. Filed by WaterIQ Technologies, LLC (Neilson, Darren)
Related: [-] 5 Notice of Incomplete Filing,43 Order Scheduling Hearing
69 69 1 pgs misc Equity Security Holders Thu 05/08 1:56 PM
Equity Security Holders of Debtor Related [+]. Filed by WaterIQ Technologies, LLC (Neilson, Darren)
Related: [-] 5 Notice of Incomplete Filing
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
68 68 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Wed 05/07 10:24 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 30. Notice Date 05/07/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 61 Clerks Certificate of Service
67 67 3 pgs order Scheduling Hearing Wed 05/07 4:41 PM
Interim Order Authorizing The Debtor to Obtain Post-Petition Financing; (2) Authorizing The Debtor to Use Cash Collateral on a Limited Basis; (3) Granting Liens and Providing Superiority Administrative Expense Status; and (4) Granting Related Relief Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 5/22/2025 at 10:30 AM at 2120 Capitol Avenue, Bankruptcy Courtroom, 8th Floor, Cheyenne, WY 82001. (dxj)
Related: [-] 10 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions
66 66 court Minutes of Proceedings (Order) Wed 05/07 4:09 PM
***DISREGARD*** Minutes of Hearing Held: Order (dxj) Modified on 5/7/2025 filed in error (dxj)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
65 65 2 pgs order Chapter 11 First Day Motions Tue 05/06 9:30 AM
Order Granting Debtor's Motion for Entry of an Order Authorizing the Debtor to Maintain Existing Insurance Policies and Pay all Policy Premiums and Brokers' Fees Arising Thereunder Related [+] (dcsl)
Related: [-] 13
64 64 2 pgs order Chapter 11 First Day Motions Tue 05/06 9:24 AM
Order Authorizing Payment of Certain Prepetition Wages, Salaries, and Other Compensation and Related Relief Related [+] (dcsl)
Related: [-] 8
Monday, May 05, 2025
63 63 30+ pgs misc Statement of Financial Affairs Mon 05/05 3:22 PM
Statement of Financial Affairs for Non-Individual Related [+]. Filed by WaterIQ Technologies, LLC (Neilson, Darren)
Related: [-] 5 Notice of Incomplete Filing
62 62 58 pgs misc Schedules A B-J Mon 05/05 3:21 PM
Schedules filed: Schedule A B, Schedule D, Schedule E F, Schedule G, Schedule H, Related [+]. Filed by WaterIQ Technologies, LLC (Neilson, Darren)
Related: [-] 5 Notice of Incomplete Filing
61 61 2 pgs court Clerks Certificate of Service Mon 05/05 9:01 AM
Clerk's Certificate of Service Related [+]. (dxj)
Related: [-] 43 Order Scheduling Hearing