California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Victoria S Kaufman
Case #: 1:25-bk-10699
Case Filed:Apr 24, 2025
Creditor Meeting:May 21, 2025

Debtor
Winndoors, LLC
19761 Bahama St
Northridge, CA 91324-3304
Represented By
David Bijan Zand
Zand Law, Apc
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Sandra McBeth (TR)
7343 El Camino Real, #185
Atascadero, CA 93422
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (SV)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 04/25/2025 12:01 AM PDT
Thursday, April 24, 2025
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Thu 04/24 12:46 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)([LINK:1:25-bk-10699] ) [misc,volp7] ( 338.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A58332373. Fee amount 338.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) Thu 04/24 12:45 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals . Fee Amount $338 Filed by Winndoors, LLC Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum or 206Sum ) due 05/8/2025. Schedule A/B: Property (Form 106A/B or 206A/B) due 05/8/2025. Schedule C: The Property You Claim as Exempt (Form 106C) due 05/8/2025. Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Form 106D or 206D) due 05/8/2025. Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Form 106E/F or 206E/F) due 05/8/2025. Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Form 106G or 206G) due 05/8/2025. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 05/8/2025. Schedule I: Your Income (Form 106I) due 05/8/2025. Schedule J: Your Expenses (Form 106J) due 05/8/2025. Declaration About an Individual Debtors Schedules (Form 106Dec) due 05/8/2025. Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors (Form 202) due 05/8/2025. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 05/8/2025. Chapter 7 Statement of Your Current Monthly Income (Form 122A-1) Due: 05/8/2025. Statement of Exemption from Presumption of Abuse (Form 122A-1Supp) Due: 05/8/2025. Chapter 7 Means Test Calculation (Form 122A-2) Due: 05/8/2025. Signature of Attorney on Petition (Form 101 or 201) due 05/8/2025. Cert. of Credit Counseling due by 05/8/2025. Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Form 2030) due 05/8/2025. Verification of Master Mailing List of Creditors (LBR Form F1007-1) due 05/8/2025. Incomplete Filings due by 05/8/2025. (Zand, David)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc List of Creditors (Master Mailing List of Creditors) Thu 04/24 1:29 PM
List of Creditors (Master Mailing List of Creditors) Filed by Debtor Winndoors, LLC. (Zand, David)
Related: [-]
3 3 court Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 (No Asset) (B/Corp No POC) (309C) (AutoAssign) Thu 04/24 2:05 PM
Notice of Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Case, Meeting of Creditors & Notice of Appointment of Interim Trustee McBeth (TR), Sandra with 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/21/2025 at 02:30 PM via Zoom - McBeth: Meeting ID 902 575 1887, Passcode 1216388636, Phone 1 804 552 2201. (Scheduled Automatic Assignment, shared account)
Related: [-]
4 4 court Notice to Filer of Correction Made/No Action Required Thu 04/24 4:47 PM
Notice to Filer of Correction Made/No Action Required: Incorrect schedules /statements recorded as deficient. Deadlines terminated for documents not relevant to a corporation filing. THE PROPER DEFICIENCIES HAVE BEEN ISSUED. Related [+] (TK)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) filed by Debtor Winndoors, LLC