California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Mark D Houle
Case #: 6:25-bk-12633
Case Filed:Apr 24, 2025
Creditor Meeting:May 28, 2025

Debtor
Beach City Towing LLC
31319 Pinon Pine Cir
Winchester, CA 92596-8355
Represented By
Daniel King
The Attorney Group
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Arturo Cisneros (TR)
3403 Tenth Street, Suite 714
Riverside, CA 92501
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (RS)
3801 University Avenue, Suite 720
Riverside, CA 92501


Docket last updated: 04/25/2025 12:02 AM PDT
Thursday, April 24, 2025
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Thu 04/24 6:12 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)([LINK:6:25-bk-12633] ) [misc,volp7] ( 338.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A58334832. Fee amount 338.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) Thu 04/24 2:40 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals . Fee Amount $338 Filed by Beach City Towing LLC (King, Daniel)See docket entry #2 for correction. Corporation Resolution Statement due 5/8/25025. Incomplete Filing due 5/8/2025. Modified on 4/24/2025 (VN)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Thu 04/24 3:35 PM
Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Petition was filed as complete, but schedules or statements are deficient. THE FILER IS INSTRUCTED TO FILE THE DEFICIENT DOCUMENTS. Related [+] (VN)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) filed by Debtor Beach City Towing LLC
3 3 misc Case Commencement Deficiency Notice (manual - ccdn) (BNC) Thu 04/24 3:41 PM
Case Commencement Deficiency Notice (BNC) Related [+] (VN)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) filed by Debtor Beach City Towing LLC
4 4 court Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 (No Asset) (B/Corp No POC) (309C) (AutoAssign) Thu 04/24 3:42 PM
Notice of Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Case, Meeting of Creditors & Notice of Appointment of Interim Trustee Cisneros (TR), Arturo with 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/28/2025 at 01:00 PM via Zoom - Cisneros: Meeting ID 981 932 8338, Passcode 8145818592, Phone 1 909 498 9294. (Scheduled Automatic Assignment, shared account)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Corp Resolution Auth Filing Thu 04/24 4:13 PM
Corporate resolution authorizing filing of petitions Filed by Debtor Beach City Towing LLC Related [+]. (King, Daniel)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)