California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Ronald A Clifford III
Case #: 9:25-bk-10557
Case Filed:Apr 24, 2025
Creditor Meeting:May 29, 2025

Debtor
O2 Japanese Restaurant, Inc.
2902 Tapo Canyon Rd Ste A
Simi Valley, CA 93063-0901
Represented By
Andrew S Cho
Andrew S Cho, A Law Corp
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
David Keith Gottlieb (TR)
21650 W. Oxnard St. #500
Woodland Hills, CA 91367
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (ND)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 04/25/2025 12:02 AM PDT
Thursday, April 24, 2025
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Thu 04/24 5:10 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)([LINK:9:25-bk-10557] ) [misc,volp7] ( 338.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A58334633. Fee amount 338.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) Thu 04/24 5:09 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals . Fee Amount $338 Filed by O2 Japanese Restaurant, Inc. (Cho, Andrew)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 (No Asset) (B/Corp No POC) (309C) (AutoAssign) Thu 04/24 7:04 PM
Notice of Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Case, Meeting of Creditors & Notice of Appointment of Interim Trustee Gottlieb (TR), David Keith with 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/29/2025 at 10:30 AM via Zoom - Gottlieb: Meeting ID 845 676 2532, Passcode 6191335280, Phone 1 747 292 5123. (Scheduled Automatic Assignment, shared account)
Related: [-]