California Central District Court
Judge:Fred W Slaughter
Referred: Karen E Scott
Case #: 8:25-cv-00854
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal - Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Apr 21, 2025
Case in other court:Superior Court of California County of Orange, 30-02024-01446315-CU-BC-CJC
Last checked: Friday Apr 25, 2025 8:07 PM PDT
Defendant
Does
Defendant
Nissan North America, Inc.
Represented By
Melissa Paulette Wilner
Klein Thomas Lee And Fresard
contact info
Anthony S. Thomas
Klein Thomas Lee And Fresard
contact info
Mikoe Tretola
Klein Thomas Lee And Fresard
contact info
Plaintiff
Marisol Quintana
Represented By
Andrew C. Jung
Quill And Arrow, LLP
contact info
Kevin Y Jacobson
Quill And Arrow LLP
contact info
Bryan C. Altman
Quill And Arrow, LLP
contact info
Danja Stocca
Quill And Arrow LLP
contact info
Siyun Yang
Quill And Arrow LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, April 28, 2025
11 11 notice Notice of Lodging Mon 04/28 4:37 PM
NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form8(Tretola, Mikoe)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Statement of Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge
Thursday, April 24, 2025
10 10 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Thu 04/24 3:00 PM
ORDER SETTING RULE 26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fred W. Slaughter: Scheduling Conference is set for 6/26/2025 at 9:00 a.m. **Counsel shall review full Order for details.** (rrp)
Related: [-]
9 9 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Thu 04/24 2:58 PM
CIVIL STANDING ORDER by Judge Fred W. Slaughter. (rrp)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Thu 04/24 10:42 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (mza)
Related: [-]
7 7 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Thu 04/24 10:41 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (mza)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Thu 04/24 10:41 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fred W. Slaughter and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (mza)
Related: [-]
5 5 transfer Intradistrict Transfer - Clerical Error (G-73) - optional html form Thu 04/24 10:31 AM
NOTICE RE INTRA-DISTRICT TRANSFER by Clerk of Court due to incorrect intra-district venue selected by the filer. Case is transferred to the Southern Division. Case has been assigned to Judge Fred W. Slaughter for all further proceedings. Any matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to Karen E. Scott. New Case Number 8:25-cv-00854-FWS (KESx). (mza)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
4 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Nissan North America, Inc., (Tretola, Mikoe)
Related: [-]
3 3 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant Nissan North America, Inc.. (Tretola, Mikoe)
Related: [-]
2 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Nissan North America, Inc.. (Tretola, Mikoe)
Related: [-]
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Central Justice Center, case number 30-2024 01446315-CU-BC-CJC Receipt No: ACACDC-39551229 - Fee: $405, filed by Defendant Nissan North America, Inc.. (Attorney Mikoe Tretola added to party Nissan North America, Inc.(pty:dft))(Tretola, Mikoe)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E
cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Thu 04/24 10:18 AM
CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does, Nissan North America, Inc.. Jury Demanded. Filed by Plaintiff Marisol Quintana. [FILED IN STATE COURT 12/11/24. SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 1 EXHIBIT A TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 ] (mza)
Related: [-]
answer Answer to Complaint (Discovery) Thu 04/24 10:22 AM
CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant Nissan North America, Inc.. [FILED IN STATE COURT 3/17/25. SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 3 EXHIBIT C TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 ](mza)
Related: [-]