Arizona District Court
Case #: 4:25-mj-04949
Case Filed:Apr 22, 2025
Last checked: Friday Apr 25, 2025 12:47 AM MST
Defendant
Marisol Tolentino-Ramirez (1)
Represented By
Kevin Clarence Lerch
Law Office Of Kevin C Lerch
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Joseph G Rieu
Us Attorneys Office - Tucson, Az
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/25/2025 2:18 AM MST
Sunday, April 20, 2025
Arrest of Marisol Tolentino-Ramirez on 4/20/2025. (REC)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Marisol Tolentino-Ramirez. (REC)
Related: [-]