California Southern District Court
Case #: 3:25-cr-01286
Case Filed:Apr 22, 2025
Last checked: Friday Apr 25, 2025 12:57 AM PDT
Defendant
Michel Enrique Peinado (1)
Represented By
Jeremy X.T. Dang
Federal Defenders Of San Diego, Inc.
contact info
Leila W Morgan
Federal Defenders Of San Diego
contact info
Federal Defenders
Federal Defenders Of San Diego
contact info
Material Witness
Francisco Javier Mendez Santos
Represented By
Christopher K. Monelt
Law Firm Of Christopher K. Monelt
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
U S Attorney CR
U S Attorneys Office Southern District Of California
contact info
Kaley Schall Chan
Doj-Usao
contact info

GPO May 02 2025
JUDGMENT as to Michel Enrique Peinado (1), Count(s) 1, CBOP: time served; $25 PA - remitted; fine - none; Count(s) 2, Government oral motion to dismiss count 2 of the Information without prejudice; granted.; Count(s) 3, Government oral motion to dismiss count 3 of the Information without prejudice; granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg. (rxc)

Docket last updated: 04/25/2025 2:37 AM PDT
Saturday, March 29, 2025
Arrest of Michel Enrique Peinado (no document attached) (gac) [3:25-mj-01498-MSB]
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Michel Enrique Peinado.(gac) [3:25-mj-01498-MSB]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Info Sheet
2 2 Minute Order. Material Witness Attorney Christopher K. Monelt for Francisco Javier Mendez Santos appointed.Set/Reset Duty Hearings as to Michel Enrique Peinado: Initial Appearance set for 3/31/2025 before Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin. (no document attached) (fjp) [3:25-mj-01498-MSB]
Related: [-]
3 3 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Kaley Schall Chan appearing for USA. (Chan, Kaley)Attorney Kaley Schall Chan added to party USA(pty:pla)(axc1). [3:25-mj-01498-MSB]
Related: [-]
4 4 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin: Status Hearing re Initial Appearance as to Michel Enrique Peinado held on 3/31/2025. Defendant rejected from MCC and given notice to appear. ( Initial Appearance set for 4/1/2025 before Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin.) (CD# 3/31/2025 MDD 25-1:6:10-6:11). (Plaintiff Attorney Carlos Arguello AUSA). (Defendant Attorney Deke Falls, Jo Tyrell FD-S/A). (no document attached) (aje) [3:25-mj-01498-MSB]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
6 6 ABSTRACT OF ORDER Releasing Michel Enrique Peinado. (ecf) [3:25-mj-01498-MSB]
Related: [-]
7 7 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin: Initial Appearance as to Michel Enrique Peinado held on 4/1/2025. Appointed Attorney Federal Defenders for Michel Enrique Peinado. Bond set as to Michel Enrique Peinado (1) Own Recognizance. No bond paperwork to be filed. Rule 5 advisement provided. ( Preliminary Hearing set for 4/10/25 at 9:30am before Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard. Arraignment set for 4/22/25 at 1:30pm before Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg. ) (Interpreter Rodolfo Martinez). (CD# 4/1/2025 MDD 25-1:3:25-3:40). (Plaintiff Attorney Carlos Arguello AUSA). (Defendant Attorney Christian Mesa FD-S/A). (aje) [3:25-mj-01498-MSB]
Related: [-]
8 8 ***Spanish Interpreter needed as to Michel Enrique Peinado (no document attached) (aje) [3:25-mj-01498-MSB]
Related: [-]
12 12 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release. Bond set for Michel Enrique Peinado (1) Own Recognizance. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 4/1/2025. (ave) [3:25-mj-01498-MSB]
Related: [-]
14 14 ORDER as to Michel Enrique Peinado: The Court orders the United States to comply with the continuing duty to disclose evidence which is favorable to the defendant as required by Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny. Upon finding that the government has failed to comply with this order, the Court may, as appropriate, order the production of such information, grant a continuance, impose evidentiary sanctions, or, in extreme cases, dismiss charges.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 4/1/25. (aje) [3:25-mj-01498-MSB]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
9 9 Set/Reset Duty Hearings as to Michel Enrique Peinado: Arraignment of MW - Francisco Javier Mendez Santos set for 4/2/2025 before Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin. (no document attached) (fjp) [3:25-mj-01498-MSB]
Related: [-]
10 10 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Leila W Morgan appearing for Michel Enrique Peinado (Morgan, Leila)Attorney Leila W Morgan added to party Michel Enrique Peinado(pty:dft) (ggv). [3:25-mj-01498-MSB]
Related: [-]
11 11 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Jeremy X.T. Dang appearing for Michel Enrique Peinado as Co-Counsel (Dang, Jeremy)Attorney Jeremy X.T. Dang added to party Michel Enrique Peinado(pty:dft) (ggv). [3:25-mj-01498-MSB]
Related: [-]
13 13 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin: Arraignment of Material Witness Francisco Javier Mendez Santos held on 4/2/2025. The Court confirms the appointment of attorney Christopher Monelt(n/a). Material Witness bail set at $5,000 PS w/10% percent cash deposit. (Interpreter Matias Pizarro). (CD# 4/2/2025 MDD 25-1:2:02-2:08). (Plaintiff Attorney Connor Veneski AUSA). (Defendant Attorney N/A). (no document attached) (aje) [3:25-mj-01498-MSB]
Related: [-]
15 15 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release for Material Witness as to Francisco Javier Mendez Santos. Material Witness Bond set for $5,000 PS secured by 10% cash deposit. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 4/2/2025. (pdc) [3:25-mj-01498-MSB]
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
16 16 BAIL REVIEW PACKET as to Michel Enrique Peinado. Report prepared by: J. Almaraz. (Document applicable to USA, Michel Enrique Peinado.) (Ramirez, C.) [3:25-mj-01498-MSB]
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
17 17 AMENDED BAIL REVIEW PACKET as to Michel Enrique Peinado. Report prepared by: C. Ramirez. (Document applicable to USA, Michel Enrique Peinado.) (Ramirez, C.) [3:25-mj-01498-MSB]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
18 18 Minute Order: Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin is no longer assigned to case and Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg is now assigned to the case. The new case number is 25MJ1498-MSB (no document attached) (ecf) [3:25-mj-01498-MSB]
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
19 19 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard: Preliminary Hearing not held as to Michel Enrique Peinado. Defense oral motion to continue hearing granted. Preliminary Hearing continued to 4/22/2025 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg. (Interpreter Matias Pizarro). (CD# 4/10/2025 9:38-9:42). (Plaintiff Attorney S/A Sheldon Smith, AUSA). (Defendant Attorney Leila Morgan, FD). (tkl) [3:25-mj-01498-MSB]
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
20 20 NOTICE of Lodgment of Information by USA (Chan, Kaley) (rxc). [3:25-mj-01498-MSB]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
21 21 INFORMATION as to Michel Enrique Peinado (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3. (mxl)
Related: [-]
22 22 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg: Arraignment on Information as to Michel Enrique Peinado (1) Count 1,2,3 held on 4/22/2025. Not Guilty plea entered. Defendant waived Indictment in open court. Motion Hearing/Trial Setting set for 6/2/2025 at 2:00 PM before District Judge Benjamin J. Cheeks. (Interpreter Ariela Edelson Torenberg). (CD# 4/22/2025 MSB 1:36-1:42). (Plaintiff Attorney Hunter Norton, AUSA S/A for Kaley Chan). (Defendant Attorney Leila Morgan, FD). (Material Witness Attorney Christopher Monelt, CJA). (mxl)
Related: [-]