Illinois Northern District Court
Case #: 1:25-cr-00216
Case Filed:Apr 22, 2025
Last checked: Friday Apr 25, 2025 2:26 AM CDT
Defendant
Marco R Berroteran (1)
Represented By
Emily Hosseini
Federal Defender Program, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Anthony Chmura
Untied States Attonrey Office
contact info
Pretrial Services
contact info
AUSA - Chicago
United States Attorney'S Office (ndil - Chicago)
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/25/2025 3:37 AM CDT
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
ARREST of defendant Marco R Berroteran. (rc, )
Related: [-]
ORAL MOTION by USA for detention as to Marco R Berroteran. (rc, )
Related: [-]
1 1 RULE 5(c)(3) Affidavit in Removal Proceedings signed by Judge Honorable Beth W. Jantz as to defendantMarco R Berroteran. (rc, )
Related: [-]
2 2 ORDER as to Marco R Berroteran: Removal proceedings held on 4/22/25. Defendant appears in response to arrest in the morning of 4/22/25. The Court finds defendant is unable to afford counsel. Enter order appointing Attorney Emily Hosseini as counsel for defendant regarding these removal proceedings only. Defendant is advised of charges and informed of his rights. Pursuant to Rule 5(f) of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure, the court orally admonished the parties, confirmed the government's obligation to disclose favorable evidence to the accused under Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny, and ordered it to do so. The Government orally moves for detention based on 18 U.S.C. 3142(f)(1)(A). The matter is set for a detention hearing on 4/24/25 at 1:00 p.m. in courtroom 1743. Identity hearing waived by the defendant. Signed by the Honorable Beth W. Jantz on 04/22/2025. Mailed notice. (rc, )
Related: [-]
3 3 ORDER Pursuant to Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 5(f) as to Marco R Berroteran. Signed by the Honorable Beth W. Jantz on 04/22/2025. Mailed notice. (rc, )
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER Appointing Counsel FEDERAL DEFENDER PROGRAM for Marco R Berroteran. Signed by the Honorable Beth W. Jantz on 04/22/2025. Mailed notice. (rc, )
Related: [-]
5 5 FINANCIAL Affidavit filed by Marco R Berroteran (SEALED). (rc, )
Related: [-]
6 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for defendant Marco R Berroteran by Emily Hosseini. (rc, )
Related: [-]