New York Eastern District Court
Case #: 2:25-cr-00138
Case Filed:Apr 22, 2025
Last checked: Friday Apr 25, 2025 3:25 AM EDT
Defendant
Faustin Nsabumukunzi (1)
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Samantha Alessi
Doj-Usao
contact info
Brian Morgan
Doj-Crm
contact info
Katherine Onyshko
Us Attorneys Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/25/2025 4:55 AM EDT
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
1 1 INDICTMENT as to Faustin Nsabumukunzi (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3. (GO) (GO). Modified on 4/24/2025 (ELR).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Criminal Information Sheet,
Att: 2 Sealing Cover Sheet
Att: 3 (4/22/2025) Indictment with foreperson signature