Texas Northern District Court
Case #: 3:25-cr-00189
Case Filed:Apr 22, 2025
Last checked: Friday Apr 25, 2025 2:27 AM CDT
Defendant
Robert Wilson King (1)
Represented By
Federal Public Defender
Federal Public Defender - Dallas
contact info
Marti Rachel Morgan-FPD
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Tiffany Hope Eggers-DOJ
U.S. Attorney'S Office - Ndtx
contact info
Douglas Burton Brasher-DOJ
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/25/2025 3:40 AM CDT
Thursday, April 03, 2025
1 1 SEALED COMPLAINT (Clerk note: This case is to remain sealed until the defendant has been arrested/appeared.) as to Robert Wilson King (1). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] and[LINK:Judge Specific Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. (mcrd) [3:25-mj-00324-BK]
Related: [-]
3 3 MOTION for Detention and MOTION to Continue filed by USA as to Robert Wilson King. (mcrd) [3:25-mj-00324-BK]
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
Arrest of Robert Wilson King. (mcrd) [3:25-mj-00324-BK]
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
4 4 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as to Robert Wilson King. Federal Public Defender for Robert Wilson King appointed. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 4/7/2025) (mcrd) [3:25-mj-00324-BK]
Related: [-]
5 5 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver: Initial Appearance as to Robert Wilson King held on 4/7/2025. Date of Arrest: 4/4/2025. Attorney Appearances: AUSA - Doug Brasher; Defense - Marti Morgan. (No exhibits) Time in Court - :05. (Court Reporter: Digital File) (Interpreter NA.) (USPO Howard.) (mcrd) [3:25-mj-00324-BK]
Related: [-]
6 6 ELECTRONIC ORDER As to Robert Wilson King: by this order -- issued to the prosecution and defense counsel -- the court confirms the disclosure obligation of the prosecutor under Brady v. Maryland , 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny, and the possible consequences of violating such order under applicable law. This written order is entered pursuant to Rule 5(f)(1) of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure, and is in addition to the oral order entered by the court on the first scheduled court date when both the prosecutor and defense counsel were present. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 4/7/2025) (mcrd) [3:25-mj-00324-BK]
Related: [-]
7 7 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting3 Motion to Continue as to Robert Wilson King (1). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 4/7/2025) (mcrd) [3:25-mj-00324-BK]
Related: [-]
8 8 ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION as to Robert Wilson King. Detention and PC Hearing set for 4/9/2025 01:00 PM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 1620, 1100 Commerce St., Dallas, TX 75242-1310 before Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 4/7/2025) (mcrd) [3:25-mj-00324-BK]
Related: [-]
9 9 (Document Restricted) CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Robert Wilson King. (mcrd) [3:25-mj-00324-BK]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
11 11 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Douglas Burton Brasher-DOJ appearing for USA as Lead Counsel . (Clerk to set designation as: Assistant US Attorney). (If sealed documents that you are authorized to see were previously filed by U.S. Pretrial Services or U.S. Probation, you will require assistance to gain access to them and any related filings. Please call the clerk at 214.753.2240 during business hours to request access.) (Brasher-DOJ, Douglas) [3:25-mj-00324-BK]
Related: [-]
12 12 EXHIBIT LIST by USA as to Robert Wilson King (Brasher-DOJ, Douglas) [3:25-mj-00324-BK]
Related: [-]
14 14 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver: Detention and PC Hearing as to Robert Wilson King held on 4/9/2025. Attorney Appearances: AUSA - Doug Brasher; Defense - Marti Morgan. (Defense Exhibits admitted electronically - not kept in the courts possession) Time in Court - 1:40. (Court Reporter: Digital File) (Interpreter NA.) (USPO Howard.) (mcrd) Modified on 4/10/2025 (mcrd). [3:25-mj-00324-BK]
Related: [-]
15 15 ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING TRIAL granting3 Motion for Detention as to Robert Wilson King (1). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 4/9/2025) (mcrd) [3:25-mj-00324-BK]
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
13 13 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 4/4/2025 as to Robert Wilson King. (mcrd) [3:25-mj-00324-BK]
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
16 16 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Marti Rachel Morgan-FPD (Clerk to Set Designation as: Federal Public Defender Appointment) appearing for Robert Wilson King (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (If sealed documents that you are authorized to see were previously filed by U.S. Pretrial Services or U.S. Probation, you will require assistance to gain access to them and any related filings. Please call the clerk at 214.753.2240 during business hours to request access.) (Morgan-FPD, Marti) [3:25-mj-00324-BK]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
17 17 INDICTMENT as to Robert Wilson King (1) count(s) 1, 2-5. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] and[LINK:Judge Specific Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. (kaf)
Related: [-]