Missouri Eastern District Court
Case #: 4:25-cr-00223
Case Filed:Apr 23, 2025
Last checked: Friday Apr 25, 2025 2:20 AM CDT
Defendant
Juan Miguel Rodriguez-Cuatianquiz (1)
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Geoffrey Stephen Ogden
United States Attorneys Office - St. Louis
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/25/2025 3:28 AM CDT
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
Warrant Issued as to Indictment in case as to Juan Miguel Rodriguez-Cuatianquiz. (JKL)
Related: [-]
1 1 INDICTMENT returned in open court on 4/23/2025 to Judge David D. Noce by the Foreperson of the Grand Jury. Referred to Magistrate Judge Rodney H. Holmes as to Juan Miguel Rodriguez-Cuatianquiz (1) count(s) 1. (JKL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Criminal Cover Sheet
2 2 REDACTED INDICTMENT returned in open court on 4/23/2025 to Judge David D. Noce by the Foreperson of the Grand Jury. Referred to Magistrate Judge Rodney H. Holmes as to Juan Miguel Rodriguez-Cuatianquiz (1): Former count 1 is now count 1r.. (JKL)
Related: [-]