Texas Western District Court
Case #: 2:25-cr-00951
Case Filed:Apr 23, 2025
Last checked: Friday Apr 25, 2025 2:23 AM CDT
Defendant
Maria Elvira Mergil-Rodriguez (1)
Represented By
Sostenes Mireles, II
Sostenes Mireles Ii Law & Associates
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Matt Ian Kass
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/25/2025 3:33 AM CDT
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
Arrest of Maria Elvira Mergil-Rodriguez (ic) [2:25-mj-00998-JAC]
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 04/02/2025 as to Maria Elvira Mergil-Rodriguez. (ic) [2:25-mj-00998-JAC]
Related: [-]
ORAL MOTION to Continue, ORAL MOTION to Detain Defendant without Bond by USA as to USA as to Maria Elvira Mergil-Rodriguez. (drda) [2:25-mj-00998-JAC]
Related: [-]
ORAL ORDER GRANTING ORAL Motion to Continue as to Maria Elvira Mergil-Rodriguez (1); GRANTING ORAL Motion to Detain Defendant without Bond as to Maria Elvira Mergil-Rodriguez (1).By Judge Joseph A Cordova. (drda) [2:25-mj-00998-JAC]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT Signed by Judge Joseph A Cordova as to Maria Elvira Mergil-Rodriguez. (ic) [2:25-mj-00998-JAC]
Related: [-]
2 2 Arrest Warrant Issued by Judge Joseph A Cordova as to Maria Elvira Mergil-Rodriguez. (ic) [2:25-mj-00998-JAC]
Related: [-]
3 3 Proceedings held before Judge Joseph A Cordova:Initial Appearance as to Maria Elvira Mergil-Rodriguez held on 4/3/2025 Detention Hearing AND Preliminary Hearing set for 4/8/2025 1:30PM before Judge Joseph A Cordova, SPANISH Language Interpreter required as to Maria Elvira Mergil-Rodriguez (Court Reporter FTR GOLD-MG CIENEGA.) (drda) [2:25-mj-00998-JAC]
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
4 4 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Sostenes Mireles, II appearing for Maria Elvira Mergil-Rodriguez . Attorney Sostenes Mireles, II added to party Maria Elvira Mergil-Rodriguez(pty:dft) (Mireles, Sostenes) [2:25-mj-00998-JAC]
Related: [-]
5 5 MOTION to Continue Preliminary and Detention Hearing by Maria Elvira Mergil-Rodriguez. (Mireles, Sostenes) [2:25-mj-00998-JAC]
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER GRANTING5 Motion to Continue as to Maria Elvira Mergil-Rodriguez (1) Detention Hearing and Preliminary Hearing RESET for 4/18/2025 09:00 AM before Judge Joseph A Cordova. Signed by Judge Joseph A Cordova. (ic) [2:25-mj-00998-JAC]
Related: [-]
7 7 ORDER as to Maria Elvira Mergil-Rodriguez, Detention Hearing and Preliminary Hearing RESET for 4/17/2025 09:00 AM before Judge Joseph A Cordova. Signed by Judge Joseph A Cordova. (ic) [2:25-mj-00998-JAC]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
8 8 Waiver of Preliminary and Detention Hearing by Maria Elvira Mergil-Rodriguez (Mireles, Sostenes) [2:25-mj-00998-JAC]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
9 9 ORDER OF DETENTION: Bond set to No Bond as to Maria Elvira Mergil-Rodriguez. Signed by Judge Joseph A Cordova. (r013) [2:25-mj-00998-JAC]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
10 10 INDICTMEN Related [+] filed. Unredacted document sealed pursuant to E-Government Act of 2002 as to Maria Elvira Mergil-Rodriguez (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4. (bot2)
Related: [-] dacted Version
12 12 Personal Data Sheet (SEALED) as to Maria Elvira Mergil-Rodriguez (bot1)
Related: [-]
13 13 NOTICE OF HEARING as to Maria Elvira Mergil-Rodriguez Arraignment set for 5/8/2025 09:00 AM before Judge Matthew H. Watters, (bot2)
Related: [-]