Texas Western District Court
Case #: 2:25-cr-01007
Case Filed:Apr 23, 2025
Last checked: Friday Apr 25, 2025 2:35 AM CDT
Defendant
Jose Luis Carrillo-Galvan (1)
Represented By
Jaime Iran Aldape
Aldape Law Firm P.L.L.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Nallely Duarte
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/25/2025 3:54 AM CDT
Sunday, March 30, 2025
Arrest of Jose Carrillo-Galvan (drda) [2:25-mj-00969-JAC]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
Warrant Returned Executed as to Jose Carrillo-Galvan. (drda) [2:25-mj-00969-JAC]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT Signed by Judge Joseph A Cordova as to Jose Carrillo-Galvan. (drda) [2:25-mj-00969-JAC]
Related: [-]
2 2 Arrest Warrant Issued by Judge Joseph A Cordova as to Jose Carrillo-Galvan. (drda) [2:25-mj-00969-JAC]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
True Name of Defendant as to Jose Carrillo-Galvan. True name of defendant is: Jose Luis Carrillo-Galvan. (mgc) [2:25-mj-00969-JAC]
Related: [-]
ORAL MOTION to Continue, ORAL MOTION to Detain Defendant without Bond by USA as to USA as to Jose Luis Carrillo-Galvan. (drda) [2:25-mj-00969-JAC]
Related: [-]
ORAL ORDER GRANTING ORAL Motion to Continue as to Jose Luis Carrillo-Galvan (1); GRANTING ORAL Motion to Detain Defendant without Bond as to Jose Luis Carrillo-Galvan (1).By Judge Joseph A Cordova. (drda) [2:25-mj-00969-JAC]
Related: [-]
3 3 Proceedings held before Judge Joseph A Cordova:Initial Appearance as to Jose Carrillo-Galvan held on 4/2/2025 Detention Hearing AND Preliminary Hearing set for 4/7/2025 9:00AM before Judge Joseph A Cordova, SPANISH Language Interpreter required as to Jose Carrillo-Galvan (Court Reporter FTR GOLD-MG CIENEGA.) (drda) [2:25-mj-00969-JAC]
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL Jaime Iran Aldape for Jose Luis Carrillo-Galvan appointed. Signed by Judge Joseph A Cordova. (ic) [2:25-mj-00969-JAC]
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
5 5 Waiver of Preliminary and Detention Hearing by Jose Luis Carrillo-Galvan (Aldape, Jaime) [2:25-mj-00969-JAC]
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER OF DETENTION: Bond set to No Bond as to Jose Luis Carrillo-Galvan. Signed by Judge Joseph A Cordova. (r013) [2:25-mj-00969-JAC]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
7 7 INDICTMEN Related [+] filed. Unredacted document sealed pursuant to E-Government Act of 2002 as to Jose Luis Carrillo-Galvan (1) count(s) 1. (bot2)
Related: [-] dacted Version
9 9 Personal Data Sheet (SEALED) as to Jose Luis Carrillo-Galvan (bot2)
Related: [-]
10 10 NOTICE OF HEARING as to Jose Luis Carrillo-Galvan Arraignment set for 5/8/2025 09:00 AM before Judge Matthew H. Watters, (bot2)
Related: [-]