Arizona District Court
Case #: 4:25-mj-08757
Case Filed:Mar 26, 2025
Terminated:Apr 03, 2025
Last checked: Friday Apr 25, 2025 1:09 AM MST
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Joseph G Rieu
Us Attorneys Office - Tucson, Az
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Edwin Wilfredo Hernandez-Chaj (1)
Terminated: 04/03/2025
Represented By
Hortencia Delgadillo
Law Office Of Hortencia Delgadillo
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/25/2025 2:58 AM MST
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
Arrest of Edwin Wilfredo Hernandez-Chaj on 3/25/2025. (CXE)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Edwin Wilfredo Hernandez-Chaj. (CXE)
Related: [-]