New York Northern District Court
Case #: 8:25-cr-00123
Case Filed:Mar 26, 2025
Terminated:Apr 22, 2025
Last checked: Friday Apr 25, 2025 3:25 AM EDT
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Leilani Dominicci-Vazquez
Doj-Usao
contact info
Jonathan S. Reiner
Doj-Usao
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Kadir Aygun (1)
Terminated: 04/22/2025
Represented By
Emma Reynolds
Office Of The Federal Public Defender - Albany Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/25/2025 4:36 AM EDT
Friday, November 01, 2024
1 1 CRIMINAL COMPLAINT as to Kadir Aygun (1). (egr) [8:24-mj-00507-DJS]
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2024
Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart:Initial Appearance as to Kadir Aygun held on 11/4/2024. Interpreter is sworn. Defendant is advised of their rights, charges, maximum penalties and given a copy of the complaint. Court determines that Defendant qualifies for counsel and the OFPD is appointed. Government moves for detention. Defense speaks and moves for release. Court sets a Detention Hearing for Tuesday, November 12, 2024, at 2:00PM. Consular notification is requested and will be made. Government reminded of their obligations under Brady v. Maryland. Appearances: Leilanie Dominicci-Vazqez, AUSA; Emma Reynolds, FPD. (Turkish Interpreter: George Asayan; USPO: Amy Brancatelli; Court Reporter: Lisa Mazzei) [Time: 3:30 PM - 3:38 PM] (egr) [8:24-mj-00507-DJS]
Related: [-]
4 4 BRADY ORDER as to Kadir Aygun: This Order is entered, pursuant to Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 5(f) and the Due Process Protections Act, to confirm the Government's disclosure obligations under Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny, and to summarize the possible consequences of violating those obligations. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 11/4/2024. (egr) [8:24-mj-00507-DJS]
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as to Kadir Aygun: Emma Reynolds for Kadir Aygun appointed. Because the defendant has testified under oath or has otherwise satisfied this court that he (1) is financially unable to employ counsel and (2) does not wish to waive counsel, and because the interests of justice so require; It is hereby ORDERED that: The Office of the Federal Public Defender for the Northern District of New York is assigned representation of the defendant. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 11/4/2024. (egr) [8:24-mj-00507-DJS]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
3 3 PRETRIAL SERVICES INVESTIGATION REPORT - [LODGED] as to Kadir Aygun. [This document has been electronically lodged with the Court and is viewable by ONLY the attorney for the government, the attorney for the defendant, and the presiding judge. Any further distribution or dissemination is prohibited.] (anp, ) [8:24-mj-00507-DJS]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 06, 2024
CLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY: Text Order previously entered at Docket Entry 6 has been deleted in its entirety as it was a duplicate entry. (egr) [8:24-mj-00507-DJS]
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 07, 2024
6 6 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Emma Reynolds appearing for Kadir Aygun Related [+] [8:24-mj-00507-DJS]
Related: [-] ynolds, Emma
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart:Detention Hearing as to Kadir Aygun held on 11/13/2024. Interpreter is sworn. Defendant consents to proceeding by video. Government seeks detention. Defense Counsel notes that because Defendant was not fully interviewed by probation they cannot determine whether there are objections or not. Defense counsel argues for the defendants release on conditions. After hearing from counsel the Court orders an interview for a full PTSR by USPO and the Detention Hearing is ADJOURNED until a later date to be determined by the court after consideration of the facility and interpreter schedules. Appearances: Leilani Dominicci-Vazquez, Esq., Special AUSA; Tim Austin, Esq., FPD. (Turkish Interpreter: George Asayan; USPO: Aimee Messier; Court Reporter: Lisa Tennyson) [Time: 2:31 PM -2:49 PM] (egr) [8:24-mj-00507-DJS]
Related: [-]
Monday, November 18, 2024
7 7 NOTICE OF HEARING as to Kadir Aygun: Detention Hearing is set for Tuesday, 11/19/2024 at 1:45 PM by TEAMS before Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart. (egr) [8:24-mj-00507-DJS]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart via Teams:Continuation of Detention Hearing as to Kadir Aygun held on 11/19/2024. Interpreter is sworn. There are no objections to the PTSR. Government argues for detention. Defense counsel argues for the defendant's release on conditions. The court rules that there are conditions of release that maybe be fashioned for this defendant. Judge Stewart explains each condition of release to the defendant and orders him released after processing. Defendant waives his right to a preliminary hearing, which Judge Stewart accepts as knowing and voluntary. Defendant will sign Order Setting Conditions of Release, the Order has been provided to Attorney Emma Reynolds, and a Release Order will be provided to the USMS. Appearances: Leilani Dominicci-Vazquez, Esq., AUSA; Emma Reynolds, Esq., FPD. (USPO: Amy Messier; Turkish Interpreter: George Esayan; Court Reporter: Lisa Tennyson) [Time: 1:47 PM - 2:27 PM] (egr) [8:24-mj-00507-DJS]
Related: [-]
8 8 PRETRIAL SERVICES INVESTIGATION REPORT (AMENDED) - [LODGED] as to Kadir Aygun. [This document has been electronically lodged with the Court and is viewable by ONLY the attorney for the government, the attorney for the defendant, and the presiding judge. Any further distribution or dissemination is prohibited.] (anp, ) [8:24-mj-00507-DJS]
Related: [-]
10 10 ORDER TO RELEASE DETAINED DEFENDANT as to Kadir Aygun. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 11/20/2024. (egr) [8:24-mj-00507-DJS]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
9 9 STIPULATION by USA to 60 day exclusion of time (Dominicci-Vazquez, Leilani) [8:24-mj-00507-DJS]
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 21, 2024
11 11 ORDER SETTING CONDITIONS OF RELEASE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 11/21/2024. (egr) [8:24-mj-00507-DJS]
Related: [-]
Friday, November 22, 2024
12 12 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to Kadir Aygun. The time within which an Indictment must be filed is enlarged 60 days. Time excluded from 11/21/2024 until 01/20/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 11/22/2024. (egr) [8:24-mj-00507-DJS]
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2024
CLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY: Docket Entry previously labeled "TEXT MINUTE ENTRY" on 11/25/2024 has been deleted in its entirety as it was erroneously docketed in this case. (egr) [8:24-mj-00507-DJS]
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
13 13 STIPULATION by USA to 60 day exclusion of time (Dominicci-Vazquez, Leilani) [8:24-mj-00507-DJS]
Related: [-]
14 14 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to Kadir Aygun. The time within which an Indictment must be filed is enlarged 60 days; time excluded from 1/16/2025 until 3/17/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 1/16/2025. (spl) [8:24-mj-00507-DJS]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Gary L. Favro:GRAND JURY makes a partial report and returns Indictment. Tally Sheet is ordered sealed. (Court Reporter Mary Beth Burnham) (ds)
Related: [-]
15 15 INDICTMENT as to Kadir Aygun (1) count(s) 1, 2-4. (ds)
Related: [-]