California Northern District Court
Judge:P Casey Pitts
Case #: 5:25-cv-03625
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause15:1601 Truth in Lending
Case Filed:Apr 24, 2025
Last checked: Friday Apr 25, 2025 1:14 AM PDT
Defendant
Activehours, Inc.
Represented By
James Pearl
Paul Hastings LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance/Substitution/Change/Withdrawal of Attorney Tue 04/29 1:24 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by Rachel E. Stone on behalf of Activehours, Inc. (Stone, Rachel)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
8 8 oth_evt Clerk's Notice ~Util - Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings Mon 04/28 9:55 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 7/31/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/7/2025 at 01:00 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (nmc, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
7 7 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Fri 04/25 5:16 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/24/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/31/2025 01:00 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor. (msr, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Fri 04/25 5:05 PM
Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Activehours, Inc. (Pearl, James)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Fri 04/25 5:03 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Activehours, Inc. (Pearl, James)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance/Substitution/Change/Withdrawal of Attorney Fri 04/25 1:44 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by Derek Evan Wetmore on behalf of Activehours, Inc. (Wetmore, Derek)
Related: [-]
3 3 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Fri 04/25 12:39 PM
Case assigned to Judge P. Casey Pitts. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (as, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Fri 04/25 11:59 AM
Civil Cover Sheet by Activehours, Inc. .(Pearl, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service
utility Electronic Filing Error Fri 04/25 8:36 AM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . Incorrect Civil Cover Sheet used. Please use our districts most current version (12/2024) found on our website www.cand.uscourts.gov. No judge assignment will be made until the document is e-filed. Submit your document using Civil Events > Other Filings > Other Documents > Civil Cover SheetThis filing will not be processed by the clerks office.Please re-file in its entirety. Re:1 Notice of Removal, filed by Activehours, Inc. (ark, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Thu 04/24 6:42 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Santa Clara Superior Court. Their case number is 25CV461322. (Filing fee $405 receipt number ACANDC-20607218). Filed by Activehours, Inc..(Pearl, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of James M. Pearl,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit C,
Att: 5 Exhibit D,
Att: 6 Exhibit E,
Att: 7 Exhibit F,
Att: 8 Exhibit G,
Att: 9 Civil Cover Sheet