Washington Western District Court
Judge:David W Christel
Case #: 2:25-cv-00761
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal - Employment Discrim
Case Filed:Apr 24, 2025
Case in other court:King County Superior Court, 25-00002-09020-5-SEA
Last checked: Friday Apr 25, 2025 1:27 AM PDT
Defendant
People Center, Inc.
Represented By
Meghan Ashley-Renee McNabb
Fisher & Phillips Llp (wa)
contact info
Clarence M Belnavis
Fisher & Phillips Llp (wa)
contact info
Defendant
Rippling PEO 1, Inc.
Plaintiff
Fu Zhou
Represented By
Lisa A Burke
Mbe Law Group PLLC
contact info
David C Martin
Mbe Law Group PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
6 6 misc Jury Demand Tue 04/29 6:05 PM
DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Plaintiff Fu Zhou (Martin, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
5 5 utility Judge Assignment Letter (Removal & Transfer cases only) Fri 04/25 10:02 AM
LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (HH)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Fri 04/25 9:57 AM
Judge David W. Christel added. (HH)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
4 4 discov Corporate/Diversity Disclosure Statement Thu 04/24 7:37 PM
CORPORATE AND DIVERSITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1) and (2). Filed by People Center, Inc.. (Belnavis, Clarence)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Declaration (non motion) Thu 04/24 7:35 PM
DECLARATION of Clarence Belnavis re1 Notice of Removal, by Defendant People Center, Inc. (Belnavis, Clarence)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Declaration (non motion) Thu 04/24 7:33 PM
DECLARATION of Emily Frey re1 Notice of Removal, by Defendant People Center, Inc. (Belnavis, Clarence)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Thu 04/24 7:28 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 25 2-09020 5 SEA; Related [+] filed by People Center, Inc..(Belnavis, Clarence)
Related: [-] ceipt # AWAWDC-8945865
Att: 1 Summons (Exhibit A),
Att: 2 Complaint (Exhibit A),
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet