Original Case: 1:25-cv-00231

Seventh Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:25-cv-01699
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Apr 24, 2025
Last checked: Friday Apr 25, 2025 5:26 AM CDT
Defendant - Appellee
CASEY'S RETAIL COMPANY
Defendant - Appellee
LANCE BOREN
Defendant - Appellee
COREENA CLOSE
Plaintiff - Appellant
MARK MARTIN
Represented By
Christina Abraham
ABRAHAM LAW & CONSULTING, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/25/2025 3:27 AM CDT
Thursday, April 24, 2025
1 1 Private civil case docketed. IFP pending in the District Court. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Mark Martin by 04/30/2025. Transcript information sheet due by 05/08/2025. [1] [7448553] 25-1699 (PS) [Entered: 04/24/2025 01:19 PM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 9 pgs Civil Case
Att: 2 2 pgs Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing
Att: 3 1 pgs Notice to District Court
2 2 1 pgs This is notification that no appellee(s) or counsel for the appellee(s) were served in the District Court. [2] [7448556] 25-1699 (PS) [Entered: 04/24/2025 01:22 PM]
Related: [-]