New York Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Louis A Scarcella
Case #: 8:25-bk-71598
Case Filed:Apr 24, 2025
Creditor Meeting:May 27, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$100,001 to $500,000
Est. Liabilities $0 to $50,000
Nature of Business Single Asset Real Estate
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Coastal Property Management Inc
3606 215th St
Bayside, NY 11361-2126
Represented By
Coastal Property Management Inc
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Long Island Federal Courthouse 560 Federal Plaza - Room 560
Central Islip, NY 11722
US Trustee Trial Attorney
Stan Y Yang
Office of the United States Trustee Central Islip Office Alfonse M D'Amato US Courthouse 560 Federal Plaza
Central Islip, NY 11722


Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Monday, April 28, 2025
7 7 order Generic Order Mon 04/28 8:28 AM
Order Directing Debtor to Obtain Counsel and to File Lists, Schedules, Statements and Other Documents by 5/8/2025. The debtor shall obtain counsel, and counsel shall file a notice of appearance with the Court on or before 5/8/2025. If the debtor fails to comply, the Court will sua sponte dismiss the Chapter 11 case without further notice Related [+]. Signed on 4/28/2025 (dhc)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Coastal Property Management Inc
Sunday, April 27, 2025
6 6 court BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Deficient Filing Mon 04/28 12:08 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Deficient Filing Notice Date 04/27/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
5 5 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors Mon 04/28 12:08 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors Notice Date 04/27/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
3 3 trustee Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 - US Trustee Fri 04/25 9:54 AM
Meeting of Creditors Filed by United States Trustee. 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/27/2025 at 02:00 PM at Telephonic Meeting: Phone 1 (877) 929-0538, Participant Code 4551117, Enter # sign. (Yang, Stan)
Related: [-]
court Prior Filings Fri 04/25 8:36 AM
[LINK:Prior Filing] Case Number(s): 19-70279 las dismissed: 02/26/2019 (gem)
Related: [-]
court Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic Auto Fri 04/25 7:30 PM
Receipt of Chapter 11 Filing Fee - $1,738.00. Receipt Number 10335950. (LS) (admin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
4 4 court Deficient Filing Chapter 11 Fri 04/25 11:50 AM
Deficient Filing Chapter 11 Filing fee for commencing a bankruptcy case pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1930a due by 4/24/2025.Affidavit Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1007-4 due 4/24/2025. 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors due 4/24/2025. Corporate Resolution Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1074-1(a) due by 4/24/2025. Corporate Ownership Statement Pursuant to FBR 1007(a)(1) due 4/24/2025. Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to FBR 1073-3 due 4/24/2025. Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individuals Official Form 206Sum due by 5/8/2025. Schedule A/B due 5/8/2025. Schedule D due 5/8/2025. Schedule E/F due 5/8/2025. Schedule G due 5/8/2025. Schedule H due 5/8/2025. Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non Individual Debtors Official Form 202 due 5/8/2025. List of Equity Security Holders due 5/8/2025. Statement of Financial Affairs Non-Ind Form 207 due 5/8/2025. Incomplete Filings due by 5/8/2025. (gem)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Letter Fri 04/25 8:38 AM
Letter Filed by Coastal Property Management Inc (gem)
Related: [-]
1 1 11 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Fri 04/25 8:35 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals. Fee Amount $ 0.00. Filed by Coastal Property Management Inc Chapter 11 Plan due by 8/22/2025. Disclosure Statement due by 8/22/2025. (gem)
Related: [-]
utility ~Force Judge Assignment Fri 04/25 8:35 AM
Judge Assigned Due to Prior Filing, Judge Reassigned. (gem)
Related: [-]