Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Beth Bloom
Case #: 1:25-cv-21893
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12182 Americans with Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Apr 25, 2025
Last checked: Friday Apr 25, 2025 12:07 PM EDT
Defendant
PROMENADE PLAZA ASSOCIATION, INC.
Defendant
SAILORMEN, INC. D/B/A POPEYES FAMOUS FRIED CHICKEN 4
Plaintiff
Carlos Brito
Represented By
Anthony Joseph Perez
Anthony J. Perez Law Group, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/19/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, May 09, 2025
8 8 misc Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 05/09 10:37 AM
Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates by Carlos Brito identifying Other Affiliate Pablo Baez, AccessAble, Other Affiliate Don Rizzie, Other Affiliate Christine Borrack, Other Affiliate David Damato for Carlos Brito (Perez, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
7 7 notice Certificate of Counsel Fri 05/02 3:18 PM
CERTIFICATE of Counsel re4 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report by Anthony Joseph Perez on behalf of Carlos Brito (Perez, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
6 6 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed Thu 05/01 7:47 AM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Carlos Brito. SAILORMEN, INC. served on 4/29/2025, response/answer due 5/20/2025. (Perez, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
5 5 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed Tue 04/29 9:45 AM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Carlos Brito. PROMENADE PLAZA ASSOCIATION, INC. served on 4/28/2025, response/answer due 5/19/2025. (Perez, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
4 4 7 pgs order Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report Mon 04/28 9:14 AM
ORDER REQUIRING VERIFIED CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL, SCHEDULING REPORT, AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 4/25/2025. See attached document for full details. (cwc)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Issued Fri 04/25 12:18 PM
Summons Issued as to PROMENADE PLAZA ASSOCIATION, INC., SAILORMEN, INC.. (cwc)
Related: [-]
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Fri 04/25 12:15 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Beth Bloom. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Marty Fulgueira Elfenbein is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (cwc)
Related: [-]
1 1 13 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 04/25 11:47 AM
COMPLAINT against PROMENADE PLAZA ASSOCIATION, INC., SAILORMEN, INC. D/B/A POPEYES FAMOUS FRIED CHICKEN 4. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-18399036, filed by Carlos Brito.(Perez, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summon(s),
Att: 3 Summon(s)