Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Jose E Martinez
Case #: 1:25-cv-21894
Nature of Suit443 Civil Rights - Housing/Accommodations
Cause42:12182 Americans with Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Apr 25, 2025
Last checked: Friday Apr 25, 2025 12:08 PM EDT
Defendant
ESBE Investments LLC
Defendant
GN Auto Center Corp.
Plaintiff
Renzo Barberi
Represented By
Ronald E. Stern
The Advocacy Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Tuesday, May 20, 2025
10 10 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Tue 05/20 11:23 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Emily Lynne Demetree on behalf of GN Auto Center Corp.. Attorney Emily Lynne Demetree added to party GN Auto Center Corp.(pty:dft). (Demetree, Emily)
Related: [-]
9 9 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Tue 05/20 9:47 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting8 Defendant ESBE Investments, LLC's Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant ESBE Investments, LLC shall respond to the Complaint on or before June 9, 2025 . Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 5/20/2025. (knu)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 19, 2025
8 8 motion Extension of Time Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Mon 05/19 8:49 PM
Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time Answer to complaint re1 Complaint, ( Responses due by 6/2/2025.), MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer by ESBE Investments LLC.(Duran, Pelayo)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit
7 7 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Mon 05/19 8:36 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Pelayo M. Duran on behalf of ESBE Investments LLC. Attorney Pelayo M. Duran added to party ESBE Investments LLC(pty:dft). (Duran, Pelayo)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
6 6 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed Wed 05/07 9:49 AM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Renzo Barberi. GN Auto Center Corp. served on 5/5/2025, response/answer due 5/27/2025. (Stern, Ronald)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
5 5 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed Wed 04/30 12:25 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Renzo Barberi. ESBE Investments LLC served on 4/28/2025, response/answer due 5/19/2025. (Stern, Ronald)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
4 4 service Summons Issued Fri 04/25 4:12 PM
Summons Issued as to ESBE Investments LLC. (caw)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Issued Fri 04/25 4:10 PM
Summons Issued as to GN Auto Center Corp. (caw)
Related: [-]
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Fri 04/25 4:06 PM
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Jose E. Martinez. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Eduardo I. Sanchez is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (caw)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 04/25 11:58 AM
COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-18399109, filed by Renzo Barberi.(Stern, Ronald)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summon(s),
Att: 3 Summon(s)