New York Southern District Court
Judge:Nelson Stephen Roman
Case #: 7:25-cv-03433
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:1125la Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Case Filed:Apr 25, 2025
Last checked: Friday Apr 25, 2025 12:08 PM EDT
Defendant
Banana Studios Entertainment Ltd
Plaintiff
Pyrovision LLC
108 Village Square #184
Somers, NY, NY 10589
Represented By
Philip Rosenbach
Berman Rosenbach, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, April 28, 2025
4 4 service Summons Issued Mon 04/28 4:17 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Banana Studios Entertainment Ltd..(pc)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Mon 04/28 11:50 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Mon 04/28 11:51 AM
Magistrate Judge Victoria Reznik is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Mon 04/28 11:51 AM
Case Designated ECF. (pc)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction Mon 04/28 11:51 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Philip Rosenbach. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $1,000,000,000; County code Westchester; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to blank; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (pc)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Civil Cover Sheet Mon 04/28 11:51 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Philip Rosenbach to RE-FILE Document No. 1 Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the form used for the civil cover sheet is not the S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet form dated December 4, 2024; the event wrong event type was used to file the civil cover sheet;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated December 4, 2024. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated December 4, 2024 is located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms/civil-cover-sheet-2.. (pc)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney to Submit AO 120 Form/AO 121 Form Mon 04/28 11:51 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO SUBMIT AO 120 FORM PATENT/TRADEMARK. Notice to Attorney Philip Rosenbach to submit a completed AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark to court for review. Use the event type AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark - Notice of Submission by Attorney found under the event list Other Documents. (pc)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Pleading Mon 04/28 11:52 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Philip Rosenbach to RE-FILE Document No. 1 Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected;. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (pc)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction Mon 04/28 11:53 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Philip Rosenbach. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 15:44;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 15:1125la;. (pc)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 04/25 12:01 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Banana Studios Entertainment Ltd., re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Pyrovision LLC..(Rosenbach, Philip)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 04/25 11:59 AM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Pyrovision LLC..(Rosenbach, Philip)
Related: [-]
1 1 10 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 04/25 11:57 AM
COMPLAINT against Pyrovision LLC. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-30986282)Document filed by Pyrovision LLC..(Rosenbach, Philip)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit C,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit D,
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit E