Member Case
Lead case is: 1:25-bk-10096

Florida Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Case #: 1:25-bk-10097
Case Filed:Apr 25, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$100,001 to $500,000
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
TRS Restaurant Holdings, LLC
3349 NW 110th St
Branford, FL 32008-7104
Represented By
Bradley R Markey
Thames Markey
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
110 E. Park Avenue Suite 128
Tallahassee, FL 32301


Docket last updated: 49 seconds ago
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
25 25 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 05/01 12:39 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 04/30/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10 Order to File Federal and State Employment Tax Returns and to Deposit State and Federal Taxes.
24 24 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 05/01 12:39 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 04/30/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 9 Chapter 11 Subchapter V Duties of the Debtor Order, Notice of Status Conference, & Deadline to File Plan.
23 23 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 05/01 12:39 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 04/30/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 4 Notice of Deadline to Cure Deficiencies.
22 22 utility utility: Submission Error Notification (SEN) - Service Related (Paperless/PDF/Pro se Form) Wed 04/30 12:13 PM
SUBMISSION ERROR NOTIFICATION: Incomplete Certificate of Service/Parties Served - Certificate of Service does not include a list of parties served and/or mailing matrix. You must file a proper certificate of service as soon as possible . Related [+] (Akinsanya, S.)
Related: [-] 20 Notice of Appearance of Attorney.
21 21 utility utility: Submission Error Notification (SEN) - Service Related (Paperless/PDF/Pro se Form) Wed 04/30 12:11 PM
SUBMISSION ERROR NOTIFICATION: No Certificate of Service - Document does not include a Certificate of Service as required by Section III. B. of the Administrative Procedures and N.D. Fla. Loc. R. 5.1(F). For more information, see[LINK:Administrative Procedures] and N.D. Fla. LBR 1009-1 for service requirements of amended schedules and Social Security or Taxpayer Identification Numbers, if applicable. Local Form 4 (LF-4), Certificate of Service, and instructions for completing a Certificate of Service (5-Inst), are available on our website at http://www.flnb.uscourts.gov/forms. You must file a proper certificate of service as soon as possible . Related [+] (Akinsanya, S.)
Related: [-] 14 Motion for Joint Administration,15 Application to Employ,16 Motion for Authority for the Payment of Pre-Petition Wages,17 Motion for Authority to Maintain Pre-Petition Bank Account.
misc Certificate of Service by CM/ECF Notice of Electronic Filing (Paperless) Wed 04/30 1:26 PM
Service to All Parties Completed by CM/ECF Notice of Electronic Filing Filed by Bradley R Markey on behalf of TRS Restaurant Holdings, LLC [Re:14 Motion for Joint Administration,15 Application to Employ,16 Motion for Authority for the Payment of Pre-Petition Wages,17 Motion for Authority to Maintain Pre-Petition Bank Account]. (Markey, Bradley)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
20 20 misc Notice of Appearance (Appearance of Attorney) Tue 04/29 4:49 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Laudy Luna on behalf of CNPXXVI Ventures LLC. (Luna, Laudy)
Related: [-]
19 19 misc Certificate of Service/Mailing Tue 04/29 4:20 PM
Certificate of Service/Mailing Filed by Bradley R Markey on behalf of TRS Restaurant Holdings, LLC [Re:18 Notice of Hearing]. (Markey, Bradley)
Related: [-]
18 18 court Hearing SET: AP or BK (PDF/Form) Tue 04/29 3:01 PM
Notice of Emergency Preliminary Hearing. Hearing scheduled on 5/1/2025 at 02:00 PM (Eastern Time) at/via Tallahassee (2nd Floor Courtroom, U.S. Bankruptcy Courthouse, 110 E. Park Ave.) . Parties may appear at the following alternate location: via Zoom (See FLNB Zoom video and telephone instructions at www.flnb.uscourts.gov/zoom ).. Related [+] SERVICE: Bradley Markey shall serve notice of this emergency/expedited hearing immediately by facsimile or email on all parties as required by applicable Rules and a certificate of service must be filed immediately thereafter. (Weems-Cainion, Janet)
Related: [-] 16 Motion for Authority for the Payment of Pre-Petition Wages,17 Motion for Authority to Maintain Pre-Petition Bank Account.
17 17 motion Motion for Authority to Maintain Pre-Petition Bank Account Tue 04/29 2:38 PM
Motion for Authority to Maintain Pre-Petition Bank Account , Continued Use of Existing Cash Management System, Continued Use of Existing Business Forms, and Banks to Honor Prepetition Payments and Transfers Filed by Bradley R Markey on behalf of TRS Restaurant Holdings, LLC (Markey, Bradley)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion Motion for Authority for Payment of Pre-Petition Wages Tue 04/29 2:38 PM
Motion for Authority for the Payment of Pre-Petition Wages , Payroll Taxes and Benefits to Non-Officer Employees Filed by Bradley R Markey on behalf of TRS Restaurant Holdings, LLC (Markey, Bradley)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Application to Employ Tue 04/29 2:37 PM
Application to Employ Thames | Markey (50 N. Laura Street, Suite 1600, Jacksonville, Florida 32202) as Debtors' Counsel Filed by Bradley R Markey on behalf of TRS Restaurant Holdings, LLC (Markey, Bradley)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Motion for Joint Administration Tue 04/29 2:36 PM
Motion for Joint Administration Filed by Bradley R Markey on behalf of TRS Restaurant Holdings, LLC (Markey, Bradley)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Certificate of Service/Mailing Tue 04/29 2:26 PM
Certificate of Service/Mailing Filed by Bradley R Markey on behalf of TRS Restaurant Holdings, LLC [Re:7 Schedules & Statements (all remaining deficient documents filed)]. (Markey, Bradley)
Related: [-]
12 12 court Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 (Form) Tue 04/29 12:43 PM
Notice of Chapter 11 Case and 341(a) Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/29/2025 at 11:00 AM, ET, at/via with the U.S. Trustee by telephone at (877) 835-0364, Access Code 4662459 . Proofs of Claims due by 7/7/2025. Government Proof of Claim due by 10/22/2025. Chapter 11 Plan (Subchapter V) due: 7/24/2025. Last day to oppose discharge is 7/28/2025. Service by the Court pursuant to applicable Rules. (Akinsanya, S.)
Related: [-]
11 11 utility utility: Submission Error Notification (SEN) - Service Related (Paperless/PDF/Pro se Form) Tue 04/29 12:40 PM
SUBMISSION ERROR NOTIFICATION: No Certificate of Service - Document does not include a Certificate of Service as required by Section III. B. of the Administrative Procedures and N.D. Fla. Loc. R. 5.1(F). For more information, see [LINK:Administrative Procedures] and N.D. Fla. LBR 1009-1 for service requirements of amended schedules and Social Security or Taxpayer Identification Numbers, if applicable . Local Form 4 (LF-4), Certificate of Service, and instructions for completing a Certificate of Service (5-Inst), are available on our website at http://www.flnb.uscourts.gov/forms. You must file a proper certificate of service as soon as possible . Related [+] (Akinsanya, S.)
Related: [-] 7 Schedules & Statements (all remaining deficient documents filed).
341info 341 Meeting Info for Ch 11 or 12 or Case Converted to Ch 7 (OUST Only) Tue 04/29 9:57 AM
Trustee's Memo re 341 Meeting: Please schedule Meeting of Creditors to be held at 11:00 AM (EST) on May 29, 2025 in BY TELEPHONE Filed by United States Trustee. (United States Trustee)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
10 10 1 pgs order Order to File Tax Returns and Make Tax Deposits (Form) Mon 04/28 6:30 PM
Order to File Federal and State Employment Tax Returns and to Deposit State and Federal Taxes signed on 04/28/2025. (ADIapps)
Related: [-]
9 9 5 pgs court Order & Notice of Status Conference - Ch 11V (Orig/Amd/Cont/Resch) (Form / PDF) Mon 04/28 2:31 PM
Order Prescribing Subchapter V Operating Procedures, Scheduling Status Conference, and Setting Deadline for Filing Plan Status hearing to be held on 6/11/2025 at 09:30 AM (Eastern Time) at/via Tallahassee (2nd Floor Courtroom, U.S. Bankruptcy Courthouse, 110 E. Park Ave.). Parties may appear at the following alternate location: via Zoom (See FLNB Zoom video and telephone instructions at www.flnb.uscourts.gov/zoom ). Subchapter V Pre-Status Conference Report due: 5/28/2025. Service by the Court pursuant to applicable Rules. (Weems-Cainion, Janet)
Related: [-]
8 8 crditcrd Auto-Docket of Online Payment Mon 04/28 12:34 PM
Receipt of Schedules & Statements (all remaining deficient documents filed)([LINK 25-10097 KKS] ) [misc,alldefic] ( 34.00) filing fee. Receipt number A5519320, amount $ 34.00 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] 7
7 7 misc Schedules & Statements (all remaining deficient docs) Mon 04/28 12:29 PM
All remaining schedules and statements (with mailing matrix) Matrix Update: New creditors added per Schedules D or E/F. (Fee Amount Due $34) Filed by Bradley R Markey on behalf of TRS Restaurant Holdings, LLC [Re:4 Notice of Deadline to Cure Deficiencies]. (Markey, Bradley)
Related: [-]
6 6 trustee Notice of Appointment of Ch. 11 Trustee Mon 04/28 11:35 AM
Notice of Appointment of Jerrett Matthew McConnell as Chapter 11 Subchapter V Trustee Filed by United States Trustee. (United States Trustee)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Verification McConnell
5 5 utility Corrective Entry w/Checklist Mon 04/28 11:13 AM
CORRECTIVE ENTRY BY CASE ADMINISTRATOR - The entry referenced hereto has been modified by the court for accuracy: Statistical Data - case was originally opened as a CH 11 non-Subchapter V case and the case has been corrected in ECF to reflect the CH 11 Subchapter V selections marked on the Petition. Related [+] (Hawkins, J.)
Related: [-] 1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition.
4 4 court Notice to Cure Petition Deficiencies (Form/PDF) Mon 04/28 10:48 AM
Notice of Deadline to Cure Deficiencies. A complete list of deficient items due from Debtors attached. Deadline to Cure Deficiency(ies): 5/9/2025 . Schedule A/B due 5/9/2025. Schedule D due 5/9/2025. Schedule E/F due 5/9/2025. Schedule G due 5/9/2025. Schedule H due 5/9/2025. Summary of Assets and Liabilities due 5/9/2025. Statement of Financial Affairs due 5/9/2025. Attorney Disclosure Statement due 5/9/2025. Service by the Court pursuant to applicable Rules. (Hawkins, J.)
Related: [-]
Saturday, April 26, 2025
court 5Alpha Case Admin Assignment (NoDoc) Sat 04/26 6:00 AM
Case assigned to Sloane Akinsanya (admin)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
3 3 misc Notice of Appearance (Appearance of Attorney) Fri 04/25 2:15 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Jason H. Egan on behalf of United States Trustee. (Egan, Jason)
Related: [-]
2 2 crditcrd Auto-Docket of Online Payment Fri 04/25 9:32 AM
Receipt of Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition([LINK 25-10097 ) [caseupld,1105u] (1738.00) filing fee. Receipt number A5518085, amount $1738.00 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] 1
1 1 9 pgs caseupld Voluntary Petition Chapter 11 (Case Upload) Fri 04/25 9:28 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition, Non-Individual (Filing Fee: $1738.00) Filed by Bradley R Markey on behalf of TRS Restaurant Holdings, LLC. (Markey, Bradley)
Related: [-]