Member Case
Lead case is: 1:25-bk-10096

Florida Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Case #: 1:25-bk-10098
Case Filed:Apr 25, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$0 to $50,000
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Santa Fe Marina LLC
3349 NW 110th St
Branford, FL 32008-7104
Represented By
Bradley R Markey
Thames Markey
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
110 E. Park Avenue Suite 128
Tallahassee, FL 32301


Docket last updated: 5 minutes ago
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
24 24 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 05/01 12:39 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 04/30/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 9 Order to File Federal and State Employment Tax Returns and to Deposit State and Federal Taxes.
23 23 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 05/01 12:39 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 04/30/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8 Chapter 11 Subchapter V Duties of the Debtor Order, Notice of Status Conference, & Deadline to File Plan.
22 22 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 05/01 12:39 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 04/30/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 5 Notice of Deadline to Cure Deficiencies.
21 21 court Hearing SET: AP or BK (PDF/Form) Wed 04/30 12:23 PM
Amended Notice of Emergency Preliminary Hearing. Hearing scheduled on 5/1/2025 at 02:00 PM* (Eastern Time) at/via Tallahassee (2nd Floor Courtroom, U.S. Bankruptcy Courthouse, 110 E. Park Ave.) . Parties may appear at the following alternate location: via Zoom (See FLNB Zoom video and telephone instructions at www.flnb.uscourts.gov/zoom ).. Related [+]; *TIME OF HEARING AMENDED. SERVICE: Bradley Markey shall serve notice of this emergency/expedited hearing immediately by facsimile or email on all parties as required by applicable Rules and a certificate of service must be filed immediately thereafter. (Weems-Cainion, Janet)
Related: [-] 12 Motion for Joint Administration,14 Motion for Authority for the Payment of Pre-Petition Wages,15 Motion for Authority to Maintain Pre-Petition Bank Account.
20 20 utility utility: Submission Error Notification (SEN) - Service Related (Paperless/PDF/Pro se Form) Wed 04/30 11:39 AM
SUBMISSION ERROR NOTIFICATION: Incomplete Certificate of Service/Electronic Recipients - Certificate of Service does not include name(s) and email address(es) of electronic recipients. You must file a proper certificate of service as soon as possible . Related [+] (Hawkins, J.)
Related: [-] 18 Notice of Appearance of Attorney.
19 19 utility utility: Submission Error Notification (SEN) - Service Related (Paperless/PDF/Pro se Form) Wed 04/30 11:37 AM
SUBMISSION ERROR NOTIFICATION: No Certificate of Service - Documents do not include a Certificate of Service as required by Section III. B. of the Administrative Procedures and N.D. Fla. Loc. R. 5.1(F). For more information, see[LINK:Administrative Procedures] and N.D. Fla. LBR 1009-1 for service requirements of amended schedules and Social Security or Taxpayer Identification Numbers, if applicable. Local Form 4 (LF-4), Certificate of Service, and instructions for completing a Certificate of Service (5-Inst), are available on our website at http://www.flnb.uscourts.gov/forms. You must file a proper certificate of service as soon as possible . Related [+] (Hawkins, J.)
Related: [-] 12 Motion for Joint Administration,13 Application to Employ,14 Motion for Authority for the Payment of Pre-Petition Wages.
misc Certificate of Service by CM/ECF Notice of Electronic Filing (Paperless) Wed 04/30 1:18 PM
Service to All Parties Completed by CM/ECF Notice of Electronic Filing of Amended Notice of Emergency Preliminary Hearing Filed by Bradley R Markey on behalf of Santa Fe Marina LLC [Re:21 Notice of Hearing]. (Markey, Bradley)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Service by CM/ECF Notice of Electronic Filing (Paperless) Wed 04/30 1:25 PM
Service to All Parties Completed by CM/ECF Notice of Electronic Filing Filed by Bradley R Markey on behalf of Santa Fe Marina LLC [Re:12 Motion for Joint Administration,13 Application to Employ,14 Motion for Authority for the Payment of Pre-Petition Wages,15 Motion for Authority to Maintain Pre-Petition Bank Account]. (Markey, Bradley)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
18 18 misc Notice of Appearance (Appearance of Attorney) Tue 04/29 4:55 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Laudy Luna on behalf of CNP XXVI Ventures LLC. (Luna, Laudy)
Related: [-]
17 17 misc Certificate of Service/Mailing Tue 04/29 4:21 PM
Certificate of Service/Mailing Filed by Bradley R Markey on behalf of Santa Fe Marina LLC [Re:16 Notice of Hearing]. (Markey, Bradley)
Related: [-]
16 16 court Hearing SET: AP or BK (PDF/Form) Tue 04/29 3:02 PM
Notice of Emergency Preliminary Hearing. Hearing scheduled on 5/1/2025 at 09:30 AM (Eastern Time) at/via Tallahassee (2nd Floor Courtroom, U.S. Bankruptcy Courthouse, 110 E. Park Ave.) . Parties may appear at the following alternate location: via Zoom (See FLNB Zoom video and telephone instructions at www.flnb.uscourts.gov/zoom ).. Related [+] SERVICE: Bradley Markey shall serve notice of this emergency/expedited hearing immediately by facsimile or email on all parties as required by applicable Rules and a certificate of service must be filed immediately thereafter. (Weems-Cainion, Janet)
Related: [-] 14 Motion for Authority for the Payment of Pre-Petition Wages,15 Motion for Authority to Maintain Pre-Petition Bank Account.
15 15 motion Motion for Authority to Maintain Pre-Petition Bank Account Tue 04/29 2:42 PM
Motion for Authority to Maintain Pre-Petition Bank Account , Continued Use of Existing Cash Management System, Continued Use of Existing Business Forms, and Banks to Honor Prepetition Payments and Transfers Filed by Bradley R Markey on behalf of Santa Fe Marina LLC (Markey, Bradley)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Motion for Authority for Payment of Pre-Petition Wages Tue 04/29 2:41 PM
Motion for Authority for the Payment of Pre-Petition Wages , Payroll Taxes and Benefits to Non-Officer Employees Filed by Bradley R Markey on behalf of Santa Fe Marina LLC (Markey, Bradley)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Application to Employ Tue 04/29 2:40 PM
Application to Employ Thames | Markey (50 N. Laura Street, Suite 1600, Jacksonville, Florida 32202) as Debtors' Counsel Filed by Bradley R Markey on behalf of Santa Fe Marina LLC (Markey, Bradley)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Motion for Joint Administration Tue 04/29 2:39 PM
Motion for Joint Administration Filed by Bradley R Markey on behalf of Santa Fe Marina LLC (Markey, Bradley)
Related: [-]
11 11 court Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 (Form) Tue 04/29 10:28 AM
Notice of Chapter 11 Case and 341(a) Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/29/2025 at 11:30 AM, ET, at/via with the U.S. Trustee by telephone at (877) 835-0364, Access Code 4662459 . Proofs of Claims due by 7/7/2025. Government Proof of Claim due by 10/22/2025. Chapter 11 Plan (Subchapter V) due: 7/24/2025. Last day to oppose discharge is 7/28/2025. Service by the Court pursuant to applicable Rules. (Isom, L.)
Related: [-]
10 10 court Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 (Form) Tue 04/29 10:23 AM
PLEASE DISREGARD ENTRY- PDF DID NOT ATTACH SEE DOCKET11 . Notice of Chapter 11 Case and 341(a) Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/29/2025 at 11:30 AM, ET, at/via with the U.S. Trustee by telephone at (877) 835-0364, Access Code 4662459 . Proofs of Claims due by 7/7/2025. Government Proof of Claim due by 10/22/2025. Chapter 11 Plan (Subchapter V) due: 7/24/2025. Last day to oppose discharge is 7/28/2025. Service by the Court pursuant to applicable Rules. (Isom, L.)Modified on 4/29/2025 (lis)
Related: [-]
341info 341 Meeting Info for Ch 11 or 12 or Case Converted to Ch 7 (OUST Only) Tue 04/29 9:59 AM
Trustee's Memo re 341 Meeting: Please schedule Meeting of Creditors to be held at 11:30 AM (EST) on May 29, 2025 in BY TELEPHONE Filed by United States Trustee. (United States Trustee)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
9 9 1 pgs order Order to File Tax Returns and Make Tax Deposits (Form) Mon 04/28 6:30 PM
Order to File Federal and State Employment Tax Returns and to Deposit State and Federal Taxes signed on 04/28/2025. (ADIapps)
Related: [-]
8 8 5 pgs court Order & Notice of Status Conference - Ch 11V (Orig/Amd/Cont/Resch) (Form / PDF) Mon 04/28 2:32 PM
Order Prescribing Subchapter V Operating Procedures, Scheduling Status Conference, and Setting Deadline for Filing Plan Status hearing to be held on 6/11/2025 at 09:30 AM (Eastern Time) at/via Tallahassee (2nd Floor Courtroom, U.S. Bankruptcy Courthouse, 110 E. Park Ave.). Parties may appear at the following alternate location: via Zoom (See FLNB Zoom video and telephone instructions at www.flnb.uscourts.gov/zoom ). Subchapter V Pre-Status Conference Report due: 5/28/2025. Service by the Court pursuant to applicable Rules. (Weems-Cainion, Janet)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Schedules & Statements (all remaining deficient docs) Mon 04/28 12:32 PM
All remaining schedules and statements (no change to matrix) Filed by Bradley R Markey on behalf of Santa Fe Marina LLC [Re:5 Notice of Deadline to Cure Deficiencies]. (Markey, Bradley)
Related: [-]
6 6 utility Corrective Entry w/Checklist Mon 04/28 12:29 PM
CORRECTIVE ENTRY BY CASE ADMINISTRATOR - The entry referenced hereto has been modified by the court for accuracy: Statistical Data - Case was originally opened as a CH 11 Non-Subchapter V case and the case has been corrected in ECF to reflect the CH 11 Subchapter V selections marked on the Petition. Related [+] (Thurman, Audrey)
Related: [-] 1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition.
5 5 court Notice to Cure Petition Deficiencies (Form/PDF) Mon 04/28 12:26 PM
Notice of Deadline to Cure Deficiencies. A complete list of deficient items due from Debtors attached. Deadline to Cure Deficiency(ies): 5/9/2025 . Schedule A/B due 5/9/2025. Schedule D due 5/9/2025. Schedule E/F due 5/9/2025. Schedule G due 5/9/2025. Schedule H due 5/9/2025. Summary of Assets and Liabilities due 5/9/2025. Statement of Financial Affairs due 5/9/2025. Attorney Disclosure Statement due 5/9/2025. Service by the Court pursuant to applicable Rules. (Thurman, Audrey)
Related: [-]
4 4 trustee Notice of Appointment of Ch. 11 Trustee Mon 04/28 11:39 AM
Notice of Appointment of Jerrett Matthew McConnell as Chapter 11 Trustee Filed by United States Trustee. (United States Trustee)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Verification McConnell
court 5Alpha Case Admin Assignment (NoDoc) Mon 04/28 10:08 AM
Case reassigned to Latonia Isom (Isom, L.)
Related: [-]
Saturday, April 26, 2025
court 5Alpha Case Admin Assignment (NoDoc) Sat 04/26 6:00 AM
Case assigned to Jestin Hawkins (admin)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
3 3 misc Notice of Appearance (Appearance of Attorney) Fri 04/25 2:16 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Jason H. Egan on behalf of United States Trustee. (Egan, Jason)
Related: [-]
2 2 crditcrd Auto-Docket of Online Payment Fri 04/25 9:32 AM
Receipt of Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition([LINK 25-10098 ) [caseupld,1105u] (1738.00) filing fee. Receipt number A5518085, amount $1738.00 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] 1
1 1 9 pgs caseupld Voluntary Petition Chapter 11 (Case Upload) Fri 04/25 9:31 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition, Non-Individual (Filing Fee: $1738.00) Filed by Bradley R Markey on behalf of Santa Fe Marina LLC. (Markey, Bradley)
Related: [-]