Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:23-bk-10554

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Bankruptcy Jud Karen B Owens
Case #: 1:25-ap-50602
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Apr 25, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
ABD Insurance & Financial Services, Inc.
Represented By
ABD Insurance & Financial Services, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Don Beskrone, Chapter 7 Trustee for Phoeno Wine Company, Inc., et al, Chapter 7 Trustee for Phoeno Wine Company, Inc., et al.
Ashby & Geddes 500 Delaware Avenue 8th Floor
Wilmington, DE 19801
Represented By
Benjamin W. Keenan
Ashby & Geddes
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Monday, April 28, 2025
3 3 crditcrd none Mon 04/28 10:43 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint([LINK 25-50602 KBO] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number Deferred, amount $ 350.00. (Hollis)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
2 2 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Fri 04/25 11:04 AM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant ABD Insurance & Financial Services, Inc.. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 6/20/2025 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. (Keenan, Benjamin)
Related: [-] ument1
Att: 1 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Fri 04/25 10:58 AM
Adversary case 25-50602 Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547, 548 and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 502 by Don Beskrone, Chapter 7 Trustee for Phoeno Wine Company, Inc., et al against ABD Insurance & Financial Services, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)). AP Summons Served due date: 7/24/2025. (Keenan, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A