Connecticut District Court
Judge:Omar A Williams
Case #: 3:25-cv-00652
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause28:2671 Federal Tort Claims Act
Case Filed:Apr 25, 2025
Last checked: Friday Apr 25, 2025 2:07 PM EDT
Defendant
Department of Motor Vehicles
Defendant
Federal Motor Carrier Safety Administration
Represented By
Julie G. Turbert
U.S. Attorney'S Office-Nh
contact info
Defendant
Ernest Galante
Represented By
Julie G. Turbert
U.S. Attorney'S Office-Nh
contact info
Defendant
Tony Guerrera
Plaintiff
Michael F. Richey
18 West Shore Road
Ellington, CT 06029


Docket last updated: 88 minutes ago
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
15 15 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Tue 05/06 12:51 PM
ORDER Granting 5 13 Motions for Extension of Time. The motions are granted. The defendants must respond to the complaint on or before July 3, 2025. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 5/6/2025. (Lussier, Nicolas)
Related: [-]
utility Update Answer Deadline Tue 05/06 5:10 PM
Answer deadline updated for Department of Motor Vehicles to 7/3/2025; Tony Guerrera to 7/3/2025. (Lewis, D)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 04/30 3:15 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Tetreault on behalf of Department of Motor Vehicles, Tony Guerrera (Tetreault, Brian)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
13 13 motion Extension of Time Tue 04/29 3:04 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time until July 3, 2025 to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Department of Motor Vehicles, Tony Guerrera. (Russo, John)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 04/29 3:00 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by John Michael Russo, Jr on behalf of Department of Motor Vehicles, Tony Guerrera (Russo, John)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
11 11 order Electronic Service Documents Mon 04/28 10:25 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of10 Standing Order re: Letters,5 MOTION for Extension of Time until July 3, 2025 to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint1 Notice of Removal, filed by Federal Motor Carrier Safety Administration, Ernest Galante, 4 Notice re: Disclosure Statement,7 Electronic Filing Order,8 Standing Protective Order,6 Order on Pretrial Deadlines,9 Notice of Option to Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction,2 Notice of Appearance filed by Federal Motor Carrier Safety Administration, Ernest Galante,3 Notice (Other) filed by Federal Motor Carrier Safety Administration, Ernest Galante,1 Notice of Removal, filed by Federal Motor Carrier Safety Administration, Ernest Galante Signed by Clerk on 04/28/2025. (Kelsey, N)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Standing Order on Removed Cases
Friday, April 25, 2025
10 10 intord Standing Order re: Letters Mon 04/28 10:22 AM
Standing Order re: Letters. Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 04/25/2025. (Kelsey, N)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Notice of Option to Consent to MJ Jurisdiction (intake) Mon 04/28 10:20 AM
Notice of Option to Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. (Kelsey, N)
Related: [-]
8 8 order Standing Protective Order (Intake) Mon 04/28 10:19 AM
Standing Protective Order Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 04/25/2025. (Kelsey, N)
Related: [-]
7 7 order Electronic Filing Order Mon 04/28 10:17 AM
ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 04/25/2025. (Kelsey, N)
Related: [-]
6 6 1 pgs order Order on Pretrial Deadlines Mon 04/28 10:16 AM
Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 6/24/2025; Discovery due by 10/27/2025; Dispositive Motions due by 12/1/2025, Signed by Clerk on 04/25/2025. (Kelsey, N)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Extension of Time Fri 04/25 2:49 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time until July 3, 2025 to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint1 Notice of Removal, by Federal Motor Carrier Safety Administration, Ernest Galante. (Turbert, Julie)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice re: Disclosure Statement Fri 04/25 2:25 PM
Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1(b), a disclosure statement required under Rule 7.1(a) must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 4/25/2025.(Maturo, F.)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice (Other) Fri 04/25 2:15 PM
NOTICE by Federal Motor Carrier Safety Administration, Ernest Galante re1 Notice of Removal, of No Pending Motions(Turbert, Julie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit State Court Order,
Att: 2 Exhibit State Court Docket
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 04/25 1:53 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Julie G. Turbert on behalf of Federal Motor Carrier Safety Administration, Ernest Galante (Turbert, Julie)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Fri 04/25 1:47 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Federal Motor Carrier Safety Administration, Ernest Galante from Rockville Superior Court, case number TTD-CV-25-5018966-S., filed by Federal Motor Carrier Safety Administration, Ernest Galante.(Turbert, Julie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit State Court Summons and Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit Certification of Scope of Employment
utility NEW Case Assignment Fri 04/25 4:13 PM
CASE ASSIGNMENT: District Judge Omar A. Williams assigned to the case. If the District Judge issues an Order of Referral to a Magistrate Judge for any matter other than settlement, the matter will be referred to Magistrate Judge Robert A. Richardson. (Oliver, T.)
Related: [-]