California Northern District Court
Judge:Alex G Tse
Case #: 3:25-cv-03635
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Case Filed:Apr 25, 2025
Case in other court:San Francisco Superior Court, CSM-25-869653
Last checked: Friday Apr 25, 2025 11:07 AM PDT
Defendant
JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By
Julieta Stepanyan
Steptoe LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Michael Brown


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, April 25, 2025
4 4 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Fri 04/25 5:27 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/18/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/25/2025 02:00 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (msr, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
3 3 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Fri 04/25 12:13 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/9/2025. (as, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Fri 04/25 10:36 AM
Certificate of Interested Entities by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. identifying Other Affiliate JPMorgan Chase & Co., Other Affiliate The Vanguard Group, Inc. for JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. re1 Notice of Removal, (Stepanyan, Julieta)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Fri 04/25 10:20 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Francisco Superior Court. Their case number is CSM-25-869653. (Filing fee $405 receipt number ACANDC-20608926). Filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A..(Stepanyan, Julieta)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet