Arizona District Court
Judge:Douglas L Rayes
Case #: 2:25-cv-01384
Nature of Suit751 Labor - Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause29:2601 FMLA: Family and Medical Leave Act (Findings and Purposes)
Case Filed:Apr 24, 2025
Last checked: Friday Apr 25, 2025 11:08 AM MST
Defendant
Grubhub Holdings Incorporated
Plaintiff
James Pineda
Represented By
Meenoo Chahbazi
Chahbazi Law PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Monday, April 28, 2025
7 7 2 pgs order Order re Rule 12(b) Motions Mon 04/28 10:44 AM
ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Senior Judge Douglas L Rayes on 4/28/2025. (SST)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Issued Mon 04/28 7:31 AM
Summons Issued as to Grubhub Holdings Incorporated. (BAS)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
5 5 service Summons Submitted Fri 04/25 3:54 PM
SUMMONS Submitted by James Pineda. (Chahbazi, Meenoo)
Related: [-]
4 4 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re:2 Summons Submitted filed by James Pineda. The submitted summons cannot be issued because the attorney information is missing from the bottom portion of the form. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please submit a revised form using the following: Civil, Amended Pleadings and Service, Service of Process, Summons Submitted. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (REK)
Related: [-]
misc Notice of Deficiency (Text Only) Fri 04/25 9:01 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re:2 Summons Submitted filed by James Pineda. The submitted summons cannot be issued because the attorney information is missing from the bottom portion of the form. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please submit a revised form using the following: Civil, Amended Pleadings and Service, Service of Process, Summons Submitted. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (REK)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
3 3 misc New Case Opened Fri 04/25 8:58 AM
Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-24224159. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Douglas L Rayes. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 25-01384 PHX-DLR. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (REK)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Submitted Fri 04/25 8:57 AM
SUMMONS Submitted by James Pineda. (submitted by Meenoo Chahbazi) (REK)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 04/25 8:56 AM
COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $405.00, receipt number AAZDC-24224159 filed by James Pineda. (submitted by Meenoo Chahbazi)(REK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet