California Central District Court
Judge:Fernando L Aenlle-Rocha
Referred: Karen E Scott
Case #: 8:25-cv-00864
Nature of Suit465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions
Cause08:1329 Writ of Mandamus to Adjudicate Visa Petition
Case Filed:Apr 25, 2025
Last checked: Friday Apr 25, 2025 11:08 AM PDT
Defendant
ROBERT JACHIM
Defendant
Marco Rubio
Plaintiff
SHAGHAYEGH DIVANYAZAR
Represented By
Curtis Lee Morrison
Red Eagle Law, L.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
FARHAD FARJOUDI
Represented By
Curtis Lee Morrison
Red Eagle Law, L.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/11/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, May 05, 2025
9 9 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Mon 05/05 11:47 AM
SEALED upon filing of the complaint by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. (doc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
8 8 cs_rasgn Returning Case for Reassignment w/i division (CV-89) Wed 04/30 9:51 AM
ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge James V. Selna. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 23-05. Case randomly reassigned from Judge James V. Selna to Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 8:25-cv-00864-FLA-(KESx). (dve)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
7 7 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 04/28 3:17 PM
60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 as to Defendants Robert Jachim, Marco Rubio. (ghap)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Mon 04/28 3:05 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Mon 04/28 3:04 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (ghap)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
4 4 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Fri 04/25 11:16 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by PLAINTIFFS All Plaintiffs, (Morrison, Curtis)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Summons Request Fri 04/25 11:08 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,1 filed by PLAINTIFFS SHAGHAYEGH DIVANYAZAR, FARHAD FARJOUDI. (Morrison, Curtis)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Fri 04/25 10:53 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs SHAGHAYEGH DIVANYAZAR, FARHAD FARJOUDI. (Morrison, Curtis)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 04/25 10:46 AM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-39580832 - Fee: $405, filed by PLAINTIFFS FARHAD FARJOUDI, SHAGHAYEGH DIVANYAZAR. (Attorney Curtis Lee Morrison added to party SHAGHAYEGH DIVANYAZAR(pty:pla), Attorney Curtis Lee Morrison added to party FARHAD FARJOUDI(pty:pla))(Morrison, Curtis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A, Section 221(g) Non-Final Administrative Processing Notice,
Att: 2 Exhibit B, April 7, 2024 Declaration of Carson Wu,
Att: 3 Exhibit C1, 9 FAM § 504.11-3(B)(2)(a) before February 26, 2024,
Att: 4 Exhibit C2, 9 FAM § 504.11-3(B)(2)(a) after February 26, 2024,
Att: 5 Exhibit D, CEAC Online Case Status,
Att: 6 Exhibit E, Plaintiffs' Inquiries and Defendants' Responses,
Att: 7 Exhibit F, Senator Inquiry and Defendants' Response,
Att: 8 Exhibit G, Congressman Inquiry and Defendants' Response