Maine District Court
Judge:Nancy Torresen
Referred: John C Nivison
Case #: 1:25-cv-00187
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Apr 25, 2025
Last checked: Friday Apr 25, 2025 2:09 PM EDT
Defendant
ANDREW LIZOTTE
Plaintiff
NATHAN REARDON
P.O. BOX 52
DETROIT, ME 04929

GPO Apr 28 2025
REPORT AND RECOMMENDED DECISION re 1 Complaint. Objections to R&R due by 5/12/2025. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)

Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
8 8 1 pgs order Order of Recusal Tue 04/29 3:17 PM
ORDER OF RECUSAL. By JUDGE LANCE E. WALKER. (mjlt)
Related: [-]
7 7 1 pgs order Order of Recusal Tue 04/29 1:39 PM
ORDER OF RECUSAL. By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (mtm)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 04/29 3:27 PM
Case Reassigned to JUDGE NANCY TORRESEN. (mjlt)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
6 6 motion Report and Recommended Decision Mon 04/28 1:08 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDED DECISION re1 Complaint. Objections to R&R due by 5/12/2025. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
5 5 order Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Costs Fri 04/25 2:20 PM
ORDER granting4 Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Costs. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Costs Fri 04/25 1:34 PM
MOTION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Costs by NATHAN REARDON (jlm)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice to Pro Se Re First Filing & Address Updates Fri 04/25 1:34 PM
NOTICE: Recently NATHAN REARDON filed a pleading in this Court without representation of an attorney. Information regarding representing yourself is available on the Court's website at[LINK:https://www.med.uscourts.gov/handout-self-represented-parties] including a Handout for Self-Represented Parties. This handout is intended for informational and practical purposes only and in no way takes the place of an attorney's legal advice, but it may provide some answers to procedural and general questions. ALSO NOTE: You are responsible for notifying the Court in writing of any changes to your mailing address or telephone number and of any change in status regarding representation by an attorney. (cc: pro se litigant) (jlm)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Fri 04/25 1:33 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET. (jlm)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 04/25 1:32 PM
COMPLAINT against ANDREW LIZOTTE with Jury Demand, filed by NATHAN REARDON.(jlm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope