Massachusetts District Court
Judge:Allison D Burroughs
Case #: 1:25-cv-11117
Nature of Suit790 Labor - Other Labor Litigation
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal
Case Filed:Apr 25, 2025
Case in other court:Plymouth County Superior Court, 2583CV00185
Last checked: Friday Apr 25, 2025 2:09 PM EDT
Defendant
Clean Harbors Environmental Services, Inc.
Represented By
Daniel R. Sonneborn
Preti Flaherty Beliveau & Pachios LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Rodney Webster


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
7 7 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 04/29 6:00 PM
Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered GRANTING6 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to May 15, 2025 to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Clean Harbors Environmental Services, Inc. answer due 5/15/2025. (CAM)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Tue 04/29 4:05 PM
Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to May 15, 2025 to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Clean Harbors Environmental Services, Inc..(Sonneborn, Daniel)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 04/29 11:52 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Hillary A. Schwab on behalf of Rodney Webster (Schwab, Hillary)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
4 4 notice Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel Fri 04/25 4:20 PM
Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email. Counsel who filed an appearance in this case prior to its removal must refer to[LINK:Local Rule 83.5.3(f)] Practice by Persons Not Members of the Bar on how to proceed as an attorney in this court. General Information for Attorneys can be found[LINK:here] . (SEC)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Case Assignment Fri 04/25 3:38 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Allison D. Burroughs assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jessica D. Hedges. (CEH)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 04/25 2:25 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Clean Harbors Environmental Services, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Clean Harbors, Inc. for Clean Harbors Environmental Services, Inc... (Sonneborn, Daniel)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Fri 04/25 2:01 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Clean Harbors Environmental Services, Inc. ( Filing fee: $ 405, receipt number AMADC-10973037 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid)(Sonneborn, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Category Form Category Form,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings,
Att: 4 Exhibit B - Declaration of Sandra Savage,
Att: 5 Exhibit C - Notice to State Court and Adverse Parties