California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Deborah J Saltzman
Case #: 2:25-bk-13421
Case Filed:Apr 25, 2025
Creditor Meeting:May 29, 2025

Debtor
JM Story, Inc.
2785 Pacific Coast Hwy # E-133
Torrance, CA 90505-7066
Represented By
Young K Chang
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Jason M Rund (TR)
Sheridan & Rund 270 Coral Circle
El Segundo, CA 90245
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 04/25/2025 12:05 PM PDT
Friday, April 25, 2025
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Fri 04/25 11:40 AM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)([LINK:2:25-bk-13421] ) [misc,volp7] ( 338.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A58337511. Fee amount 338.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) Fri 04/25 11:28 AM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals . Fee Amount $338 Filed by JM Story, Inc. (Chang, Young)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 (No Asset) (B/Corp No POC) (309C) (AutoAssign) Fri 04/25 11:36 AM
Notice of Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Case, Meeting of Creditors & Notice of Appointment of Interim Trustee Rund (TR), Jason M with 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/29/2025 at 11:00 AM via Zoom - Rund: Meeting ID 377 810 4184, Passcode 9476458731, Phone 1 213 592 2312. (Scheduled Automatic Assignment, shared account)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Corp Resolution Auth Filing Fri 04/25 11:51 AM
Corporate resolution authorizing filing of petitions Filed by Debtor JM Story, Inc.. (Chang, Young)
Related: [-]