Tennessee Middle District Court
Judge:Aleta A Trauger
Case #: 3:25-cv-00467
Nature of Suit751 Labor - Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause29:2601 Family Medical Leave Act
Case Filed:Apr 25, 2025
Last checked: Friday Apr 25, 2025 2:10 PM CDT
Defendant
MHM Health Professionals, LLC
Plaintiff
William Richie, M.D.
Represented By
Kyle Frederick Biesecker
Biesecker Dutkanych & Macer, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
9 9 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 05/06 3:45 PM
SUMMONS returned executed by William Richie, M.D.. MHM Health Professionals, LLC served on 5/2/2025. (Biesecker, Kyle)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
8 8 service Summons Issued Tue 04/29 1:42 PM
Summons issued as to MHM Health Professionals, LLC. Counsel is responsible for printing and serving the summons after it is issued by the Clerk's Office. (ch)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
7 7 notice Notice of Summons to be Issued Fri 04/25 5:59 PM
NOTICE of Summons to be Issued as to MHM HEALTH PROFESSIONALS, LLC d/b/a CENTURION. Counsel is responsible for printing and serving the summons after it is issued by the Clerk's Office. (Biesecker, Kyle)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Case Management Conference Fri 04/25 11:29 AM
NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/21/2025 at 02:00 PM in Chambers - Suite 6325 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (ad)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice/Information re Consent of the Parties to MJ Fri 04/25 11:26 AM
NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (ad)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Business Entity Disclosure Statement Filing Requirement Fri 04/25 11:26 AM
NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (ad)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Admin Order 217 Fri 04/25 11:25 AM
NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (ad)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 04/25 11:25 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kyle Frederick Biesecker on behalf of William Richie, M.D. (ad)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 04/25 11:24 AM
COMPLAINT against MHM Health Professionals, LLC (Filing fee $405, Receipt number ATNMDC-4309409), filed by William Richie, M.D..(ad)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet
misc Annotation - Bar Status Fri 04/25 11:31 AM
TN State Bar status verified as active for Kyle Frederick Biesecker admitted to this court . (ad)
Related: [-]