Vu et al v. Mayorkas et al
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Terry R Means |
Case #: | 4:25-cv-00455 |
Nature of Suit | 465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions |
Cause | 28:1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus |
Case Filed: | Apr 25, 2025 |
Case in other court: | Texas Southern, 4:24-cv-04867 |
Last checked: Friday Apr 25, 2025 2:11 PM CDT |
Defendant
Alissa Emmel
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Merrick Garland
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Director, USCIS Ur Mendoza Jaddou
Camp Springs, MD 20588
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Lisa Kehl
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Alejandro Mayorkas
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Tracy Tarango
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Director Christopher A Wray
Washington, DC 20530
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
G. H. V.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
P. H. V.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
HOANG HAI VU
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
THI THANH HA VU
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
VAN HOAN VU
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Friday, April 25, 2025 | ||
26 | 26
![]() New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge Means. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (jnp) |
|
25 | 25
![]() Case electronically transferred in from District of Texas Southern; Case Number 4:24-cv-04867. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Copy of NEF to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed. |
|
Interdistrict transfer to Northern District of Texas, Fort Worth Division. Case transferred electronically, filed. (jmm4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 4/25/2025.] | ||
utility
Case Transferred Out - District Transfer (Public Entry)
Fri 04/25 10:38 AM
Interdistrict transfer to Northern District of Texas, Fort Worth Division. Case transferred electronically, filed. (jmm4) |
||
Thursday, April 24, 2025 | ||
24 | 24
![]() ORDER granting in part15 Motion to Dismiss and15 Motion to Sever. Claims of remaining Plaintiffs to be severed into three distinct groups as listed in the order. Group One and Group Two to be transferred to the NDTX, Fort Worth Division. Group Three to be transferred to the District of Columbia. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter Bray) Parties notified. (jmm4) |
|
23 | 23
![]() MINUTE ENTRY ORDER: Initial Conference held Appearances: Judy Nguyen. Appearances: Shawn David Ren. Ct Reporter: ERO. Written Order on15 Motion to Dismiss and Sever to be entered. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter Bray) Parties notified. (jmm4) |
|
22 | 22
![]() |
|
Wednesday, April 23, 2025 | ||
21 | 21
![]() |
|
Wednesday, March 26, 2025 | ||
20 | 20
![]() |
|
Monday, March 24, 2025 | ||
19 | 19
![]() |
|
Friday, March 21, 2025 | ||
18 | 18
![]() |
|
Tuesday, March 18, 2025 | ||
17 | 17
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Monday, March 17, 2025 | ||
16 | 16
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Friday, March 14, 2025 | ||
15 | 15
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Monday, March 10, 2025 | ||
14 | 14
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
Att: 7
![]() |
||
Att: 8
![]() |
||
Att: 9
![]() |
||
Att: 10
![]() |
||
Att: 11
![]() |
||
Att: 12
![]() |
||
Att: 13
![]() |
||
Att: 14
![]() |
||
Att: 15
![]() |
||
Friday, February 14, 2025 | ||
13 | 13
![]() |
|
Thursday, February 13, 2025 | ||
12 | 12
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
Att: 7
![]() |
||
Friday, January 03, 2025 | ||
11 | 11
![]() |
|
Tuesday, December 31, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
Att: 7
![]() |
||
9 | 9
![]() |
|
8 | 8
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Wednesday, December 18, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
![]() |
|
6 | 6
![]() |
|
5 | 5
![]() |
|
Friday, December 13, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
![]() |
|
3 | 3
![]() |
|
Referral Judge Selected: Magistrate Judge Peter Bray randomly selected to receive referrals. The selected Magistrate Judge is not assigned to this case until a District Judge refers the case or a motion or the parties consent to jurisdiction of the Magistrate Judge. Once a referral has been made, the name of the referral judge will appear at the top of the docket sheet. (hem4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 4/25/2025.] | ||
Wednesday, December 11, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
Att: 7
![]() |
||
1 | 1
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |