Delaware District Court
Judge:Jennifer L Hall
Case #: 1:25-cv-00507
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:501 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:Apr 25, 2025
Last checked: Friday Apr 25, 2025 4:10 PM EDT
Defendant
The Wrap News Inc.
Plaintiff
Valnet Inc.
Represented By
Jeffrey B. Bove
Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney PC
contact info
Rex A. Donnelly, IV
Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney PC
contact info
Christopher H. Blaszkowski
Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Hassan Youssef
Represented By
Jeffrey B. Bove
Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney PC
contact info
Rex A. Donnelly, IV
Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney PC
contact info
Christopher H. Blaszkowski
Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 04/30 2:45 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Valnet Inc., Hassan Youssef.The Wrap News Inc. served on 4/28/2025, answer due 5/19/2025. (Bove, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 04/30 9:29 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Jennifer L. Hall. Please include the initials of the Judge (JLH) after the case number on all documents filed. (alb)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
utility - CORRECTING ENTRY Mon 04/28 10:14 AM
CORRECTING ENTRY: D.I. 4 removed, error in defendants name. (slk)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
4 4 service Summons Issued Fri 04/25 3:46 PM
Summons Issued as to The Wrap News Inc. on 4/28/2025. (slk)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1 Fri 04/25 3:45 PM
Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent VBS Group Inc. for Valnet Inc. - filed by Valnet Inc. (jfm)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Magistrate Consent Forms Fri 04/25 3:44 PM
Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (jfm)
Related: [-]
1 1 20 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 04/25 3:44 PM
COMPLAINT against The Wrap News Inc. (Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ADEDC-4670812) - filed by Valnet Inc., Hassan Youssef.(jfm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet