Robinson v. Covidien LP et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:22-md-03029
Lead case: 1:22-md-03029
Massachusetts District Court | |
Judge: | Patti B Saris |
Case #: | 1:25-cv-11120 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Property Damage |
Case Filed: | Apr 25, 2025 |
Last checked: Friday Apr 25, 2025 4:09 PM EDT |
Defendant
Covidien LP
|
|
Defendant
Sofradim Production SAS
|
|
Plaintiff
Donnell Robinson
|
Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, April 29, 2025 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (AB) |
|
Monday, April 28, 2025 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice re: MDL Case Opened
Mon 04/28 8:50 AM
NOTICE OF MDL CASE OPENED, Direct file in the District of Massachusetts; 1:25-cv-11120-PBS Robinson v. Covidien LP et al. In Re: Covidien Hernia Mesh Products Liability Litigation No. II, MDL 3029. (JAM) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Case Assignment
Mon 04/28 8:50 AM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Patti B. Saris assigned to case. (JAM) |
|
Friday, April 25, 2025 | ||
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 405, receipt number AMADC-10973567 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Donnell Robinson.(Fraser, Scott) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |