Michigan Eastern District Court
Judge:Susan K Declercq
Referred: Kimberly G Altman
Case #: 2:25-cv-11189
Nature of Suit530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General
CauseNo cause code entered
Case Filed:Apr 25, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/01/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, April 28, 2025
5 5 notice Regarding Parties Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes* Mon 04/28 12:48 PM
Notice Regarding Parties' Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (ABun)
Related: [-]
4 4 order Requiring Responsive Pleading* Mon 04/28 11:39 AM
ORDER Requiring Response to1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Attached Petition has been electronically served on the Michigan Attorney General and the Michigan Department of Corrections. Response due by 10/27/2025 Signed by Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. (LGra)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Document Continuation Habeas Petition
3 3 1 pgs order Order on Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs Mon 04/28 9:52 AM
ORDER granting2 Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. (LGra)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
2 2 petition Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs Fri 04/25 3:27 PM
APPLICATION to Proceed without prepaying fees or costs by Jermari Yero Price. (MCho)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Civil Case - Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Fri 04/25 3:26 PM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Jermari Yero Price against Matt Macauley. (MCho)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Coversheet