Texas Northern District Court
Judge:Reed C O'Connor
Case #: 4:25-cv-00456
Nature of Suit465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions
Cause28:1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus
Case Filed:Apr 25, 2025
Case in other court:Texas Southern, 4:24-cv-04867
Last checked: Friday Apr 25, 2025 3:14 PM CDT
Defendant
Alissa Emmel
Represented By
Shawn David Ren
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
Merrick Garland
Represented By
Shawn David Ren
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
Director, USCIS Ur Mendoza Jaddou
Camp Springs, MD 20588
Represented By
Shawn David Ren
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
Lisa Kehl
Represented By
Shawn David Ren
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
Alejandro Mayorkas
Represented By
Shawn David Ren
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
Tracy Tarango
Represented By
Shawn David Ren
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
Director Christopher A Wray
Washington, DC 20530
Represented By
Shawn David Ren
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Plaintiff
H. N. L.
Represented By
Michael Hoc Cao
Cao & Associates PC
contact info
Plaintiff
N. H. L.
Represented By
Michael Hoc Cao
Cao & Associates PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Thi Minh Thao Le
Represented By
Michael Hoc Cao
Cao & Associates PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Huu Huy Lee
Represented By
Michael Hoc Cao
Cao & Associates PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, May 05, 2025
27 27 order Order Mon 05/05 3:42 PM
ORDER: This action was recently transferred to this Court after the Plaintiffs were severed into three distinct groups. See ECF No.24 . Plaintiffs are hereby ORDERED to file an amended complaint with only the Plaintiffs who are part of this action. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 5/5/2025) (mmw)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
26 26 qcref O' Connor (FORT WORTH CASES) Fri 04/25 4:19 PM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge O'Connor. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (jnp)
Related: [-]
25 25 utility Electronic Case Transferred In - District Transfer (Public Entry) Fri 04/25 2:02 PM
Case electronically transferred in from District of Texas Southern; Case Number 4:24-cv-04867. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Copy of NEF to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed.
Related: [-]
Interdistrict transfer to Northern District of Texas, Fort Worth Division. Case transferred electronically, filed. (jmm4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 4/25/2025.]
Related: [-]
utility Case Transferred Out - District Transfer (Public Entry) Fri 04/25 10:38 AM
Interdistrict transfer to Northern District of Texas, Fort Worth Division. Case transferred electronically, filed. (jmm4)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
24 24 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Order on Motion to Sever Fri 04/25 10:34 AM
ORDER granting in part15 Motion to Dismiss and15 Motion to Sever. Claims of remaining Plaintiffs to be severed into three distinct groups as listed in the order. Group One and Group Two to be transferred to the NDTX, Fort Worth Division. Group Three to be transferred to the District of Columbia. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter Bray) Parties notified. (jmm4)
Related: [-]
23 23 1 pgs order Order Fri 04/25 10:05 AM
MINUTE ENTRY ORDER: Initial Conference held Appearances: Judy Nguyen. Appearances: Shawn David Ren. Ct Reporter: ERO. Written Order on15 Motion to Dismiss and Sever to be entered. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter Bray) Parties notified. (jmm4)
Related: [-]
22 22 Agreed PROPOSED ORDER on Severance and Transfer re:21 Response in Opposition to Motion,15 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Sever, filed. (Nguyen, Judy) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 4/25/2025.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
21 21 RESPONSE in Opposition to15 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Sever, filed by H. N. L., N. H. L., Thi Minh Thao Le, Huu Huy Lee, Tra Son Nguyen, G. H. V., P. H. V., Hoang Hai Vu, Thi Thanh Ha Vu, Van Hoan Vu. (Cao, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 4/25/2025.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
20 20 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 4/24/2025 at 10:15 AM in Courtroom 703 before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray (Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter Bray) Parties notified. (jmm4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 4/25/2025.]
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
19 19 ORDER OF PARTIAL DISMISSAL - Pltfs filed a18 Notice of Partial Dismissal stipulating to the voluntary dismissal of this action as moot against all named Defendants pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i). Plaintiffs assert that their petitions and applications have been adjudicated and, as such, their individual claims of delay are moot. Accordingly, this Court accepts the Notice of Partial Dismissal and the claims of Plaintiffs, Thi Thuy Hang Thai, Quoc Hung Le, T.K.V.L., T.Q.T.L., Ly Ly Le, Van Dung Nguyen, Le Hao Khang Nguyen, Le Trang Nghi Nguyen, Cuc Thi Le, Antonino Alanis and Tam Nguyen Minh Ngo, only, are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Each party will bear its own costs...*** TERMINATED PARTIES: T.Q. T. L., Cuc Thi Le, Ly Ly Le, Quoc Hung Le, Tam Nguyen Minh Ngo, Le Hao Khang Nguyen, Le Trang Nghi Nguyen, Van Dung Nguyen, Thi Thuy Hang Thai, Antonio Alanis and T.K. V. L...*** Attorney Michael Hoc Cao terminated. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (sra4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 4/25/2025.]
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
18 18 NOTICE of Partial Dismissal as to T.Q. T. L., Antonio Alanis, Van Dung Nguyen, Cuc Thi Le, Quoc Hung Le, Ly Ly Le, Le Hao Khang Nguyen, Le Trang Nghi Nguyen, Thi Thuy Hang Thai, Tam Nguyen Minh Ngo, T.K. V. L. by T.Q. T. L., Thi Minh Thao Le, Antonio Alanis, Van Hoan Vu, Le Huy Le, Hoang Hai Vu, H. N. L., Van Dung Nguyen, Thi Thanh Ha Vu, Tra Son Nguyen, Cuc Thi Le, Quoc Hung Le, Ly Ly Le, Le Hao Khang Nguyen, Le Trang Nghi Nguyen, P. H. V., Thi Thuy Hang Thai, Tam Nguyen Minh Ngo, N. H. L., Huu Huy Lee, T.K. V. L., G. H. V., filed. (Cao, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 4/25/2025.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
17 17 Opposed JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by T.K. V. L., T.Q. T. L., Ly Ly Le, Van Dung Nguyen, Le Hao Khang Nguyen, Le Trang Nghi Nguyen, Thi Thanh Ha Vu, Van Hoan Vu, Hoang Hai Vu, G. H. V., P. H. V., Thi Minh Thao Le, Le Huy Le, H. N. L., N. H. L., Cuc Thi Le, Antonio Alanis, Tra Son Nguyen, Tam Nguyen Minh Ngo, Huu Huy Lee, Thi Thuy Hang Thai, Quoc Hung Le, filed. (Cao, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 4/25/2025.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Plaintiffs' Proposed Docket Control Order
Monday, March 17, 2025
16 16 ORDER - CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Peter Bray. Parties to advise court w/in 20 days if they will consent to Judge Bray. *** Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference set on March 28, 2025 at 2:00pm is CANCELED *** (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (sra4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 4/25/2025.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Consent Form
Friday, March 14, 2025
15 15 MOTION to Dismiss , MOTION to Sever ( Motion Docket Date 4/4/2025.) by Alejandro Mayorkas, Merrick Garland, Ur Mendoza Jaddou, Tracy Tarango, Alissa Emmel, Lisa Kehl, Christopher A. Wray, filed. Related [+] [Transferred from Texas Southern on 4/25/2025.]
Related: [-] n, Shawn
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, March 10, 2025
14 14 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to All Defendants, filed. (Cao, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 4/25/2025.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Amended Summons Return for Civil Process Clerk,
Att: 2 Summons Return for Alissa Emmel,
Att: 3 Amended Summons Return for Alissa Emmel,
Att: 4 Summons Return for Alejandro Mayorkas,
Att: 5 Amended Summons Return - Alejandro Mayorkas,
Att: 6 Summons Return for Christopher A. Wray,
Att: 7 Amended Summons Return for Christopher A. Wray,
Att: 8 Summons Return - Lisa Kehl,
Att: 9 Amended Summons Return for Lisa Kehl,
Att: 10 Summons Return - Merrick Garland,
Att: 11 Amended Summons Return for Merrick Garland,
Att: 12 Summons Return for Tracy Tarango,
Att: 13 Amended Summons Return for Tracy Tarango,
Att: 14 Summons Return for Ur Mendoza Jaddou,
Att: 15 Amended Summons Return for Ur Mendoza Jaddou
Friday, February 14, 2025
13 13 Summons Issued as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Issued summons returned to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (rlm4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 4/25/2025.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
12 12 Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, Civil Process Clerk for US Attorney for the Southern District of Texas, filed. (Cao, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 4/25/2025.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons for Alissa Emmel,
Att: 2 Summons for Alejandro Mayorkas,
Att: 3 Summons for Christopher A. Wray,
Att: 4 Summons for Lisa Kehl,
Att: 5 Summons for Merrick Garland,
Att: 6 Summons for Tracy Tarango,
Att: 7 Summons for Ur Mendoza Jaddou
Friday, January 03, 2025
11 11 Summons Issued as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Issued summons returned to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (rlm4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 4/25/2025.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 31, 2024
10 10 Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, Civil Process Clerk for US Attorney for the Southern District of Texas, filed. (Cao, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 4/25/2025.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons for Alissa Emmel,
Att: 2 Summons for Alejandro Mayorkas,
Att: 3 Summons for Christopher A. Wray,
Att: 4 Summons for Lisa Kehl,
Att: 5 Summons for Merrick Garland,
Att: 6 Summons for Tracy Tarango,
Att: 7 Summons for Ur Mendoza Jaddou
9 9 Amended CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Tam Nguyen Minh Ngo, filed. (Cao, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 4/25/2025.]
Related: [-]
8 8 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by T.Q. T. L., Thi Minh Thao Le, Antonio Alanis, Van Hoan Vu, Le Huy Le, Hoang Hai Vu, H. N. L., Van Dung Nguyen, Thi Thanh Ha Vu, Tra Son Nguyen, Cuc Thi Le, Quoc Hung Le, Ly Ly Le, Le Hao Khang Nguyen, Le Trang Nghi Nguyen, P. H. V., Thi Thuy Hang Thai, N. H. L., T.K. V. L., G. H. V., Tam Nguyen Minh Ngo. Related document:1 Petition/Complaint for Writ of Mandamus, filed by Le Trang Nghi Nguyen, T.K. V. L., Van Hoan Vu, Quoc Hung Le, Thi Minh Thao Le, Le Huy Le, Le Hao Khang Nguyen, Tra Son Nguyen, Ly Ly Le, N. H. L., Thi Thanh Ha Vu, G. H. V., P. H. V., Thi Thuy Hang Thai, Cuc Thi Le, Antonio Alanis, Hoang Hai Vu, H. N. L., T.Q. T. L., Van Dung Nguyen. (Cao, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 4/25/2025.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Amended Table of Exhibits and Exhibits A-EE
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
7 7 First CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by T.K. V. L., T.Q. T. L., Ly Ly Le, Van Dung Nguyen, Le Hao Khang Nguyen, Le Trang Nghi Nguyen, Thi Thanh Ha Vu, Van Hoan Vu, Hoang Hai Vu, G. H. V., P. H. V., Thi Minh Thao Le, Le Huy Le, H. N. L., N. H. L., Cuc Thi Le, Antonio Alanis, Tra Son Nguyen, Thi Thuy Hang Thai, Quoc Hung Le, filed. (Cao, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 4/25/2025.]
Related: [-]
6 6 Summons Issued as to Alissa Emmel, Lisa Kehl, Tracy Tarango, Christopher A. Wray, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Issued summons returned to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (bmn4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 4/25/2025.]
Related: [-]
5 5 Summons Issued as to Merrick Garland, Ur Mendoza Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Issued summons returned to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (bmn4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 4/25/2025.]
Related: [-]
Friday, December 13, 2024
4 4 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 3/28/2025 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9B before Judge Sim Lake. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (hem4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 4/25/2025.]
Related: [-]
3 3 CLERKS NOTICE Regarding Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. Parties notified, filed. (hem4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 4/25/2025.]
Related: [-]
Referral Judge Selected: Magistrate Judge Peter Bray randomly selected to receive referrals. The selected Magistrate Judge is not assigned to this case until a District Judge refers the case or a motion or the parties consent to jurisdiction of the Magistrate Judge. Once a referral has been made, the name of the referral judge will appear at the top of the docket sheet. (hem4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 4/25/2025.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
2 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, Civil Process Clerk for US Attorney for the Southern District of Texas, filed. (Cao, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 4/25/2025.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons for Alejandro Mayorkas,
Att: 2 Summons for Merrick Garland,
Att: 3 Summons for Ur Mendoza Jaddou,
Att: 4 Summons for Tracy Tarango,
Att: 5 Summons for Alissa Emmel,
Att: 6 Summons for Lisa Kehl,
Att: 7 Summons for Christopher A. Wray
1 1 PETITION/COMPLAINT for Writ of Mandamus (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXSDC-32616546.) filed by T.Q. T. L., THI MINH THAO LE, ANTONINO ALANIS, VAN HOAN VU, HUU HUY LE, HOANG HAI VU, H. N. L., VAN DUNG NGUYEN, THI THANH HA VU, TRA SON NGUYEN, CUC THI LE, QUOC HUNG LE, LY LY LE, LE HAO KHANG NGUYEN, LE TRANG NGHI NGUYEN, P. H. V., THI THUY HANG THAI, N. H. L., T.K. V. L., G. H. V.. (Cao, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 4/25/2025.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibits A-AA,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet