Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:25-bk-30484

Oregon Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Peter C Mckittrick
Case #: 3:25-ap-03023
Nature of Suit31 Bankruptcy - Approval of sale of property of estate and of a co-owner - §363(h)
Case Filed:Apr 24, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Star Junction 49, LLC
7226 Lee Deforest D, Ste 200
Columbia, MD 21046
Represented By
Star Junction 49, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Sherwood Hospitality Group, LLC
12330 SE 5th St, 3rd Fl
Vancouver, WA 98683
Represented By
CHRISTOPHER N COYLE
Sussman Shank LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 1:06 PM PDT
Friday, April 25, 2025
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed [May use LBF 305 12/1/19] Fri 04/25 2:38 PM
Summons Served on Star Junction 49, LLC 4/25/2025. (COYLE, CHRISTOPHER) Corrected docket text. Modified on 4/25/2025 (cml)
Related: [-]
3 3 court Summons Issued Fri 04/25 7:42 AM
Summons Issued for service on Star Junction 49, LLC1 Complaint Pretrial Hearing Set for 6/10/2025 at 09:30 AM in/by Telephone Hearing - PCM Dial (855) 244-8681, Enter Meeting ID 2311 562 9438#. (krw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
2 2 crditcrd none Thu 04/24 3:35 PM
Receipt of Filing Fee for Complaint([LINK 25-03023 pcm] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number A22372631. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 04/24 3:33 PM
Adversary case 25-03023 Complaint by Sherwood Hospitality Group, LLC against Star Junction 49 LLC. $350 Filing Fee. Nature of Suit:(31 (Approval of sale of property of estate and of a co-owner - 363(h)))(COYLE, CHRISTOPHER)
Related: [-]