California Southern District Court
Judge:Michael M Anello
Referred: Michael S Berg
Case #: 3:25-cv-01049
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:2201dj Declaratory Judgment
Case Filed:Apr 25, 2025
Case in other court:Illinois Central, 1:25-cv-01086
Last checked: Friday Apr 25, 2025 2:06 PM PDT
Defendant
Lytx Inc
Represented By
Kingshuk Roy
Freeman Mathis & Gary, LLP
contact info
Sophia Stevanovich
contact info
Plaintiff
ELM One Call Locators, Inc
Represented By
Samuel Benjamin Zabek
Graves Law Offices, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
One Call Locators, Ltd


Docket last updated: 05/19/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, May 08, 2025
17 17 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Thu 05/08 2:19 PM
ORDER Granting15 Joint Motion for Extension of Time. Lytx Inc answer due 5/27/2025. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 5/8/25. (aas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
16 16 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 05/07 4:40 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph A Gonnella on behalf of Lytx Inc (Gonnella, Joseph)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 05/07 4:39 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer To Plaintiffs' Complaint by Lytx Inc. (Gonnella, Joseph)Attorney Joseph A Gonnella added to party Lytx Inc(pty:dft)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
14 14 misc Electronic Transfer In Fri 04/25 1:05 PM
Judge Michael M. Anello and Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg assigned to transfer case from Central District of Illinois. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(no document attached) (jmo)
Related: [-]
13 13 cmp Case Transferred In - District Transfer (Electronic Transfers Only) Fri 04/25 12:54 PM
Case transferred in from District of Illinois Central; Case Number 1:25-cv-01086. Original file received electronically (jmo)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
12 12 ORDER entered by District Judge Jonathan E Hawley on 4/22/2025. Defendant Lytx, Inc.'s Motion to Transfer Venue (D.5 ) is GRANTED. The Clerk is directed to transfer this case to the U.S. District Court for the Southern District of California. SEE WRITTEN ORDER. (SB) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 4/25/2025.]
Related: [-]
11 11 Defendant Lytx, Inc. Reply Memorandum in Support of Its Motion to Transfer Venue re5 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Defendant Lytx Inc. (TK) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 4/25/2025.]
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
TEXT ORDER granting9 the Defendant's Motion for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of its Motion to Transfer Venue. The Clerk is directed to docket the [9-1] Reply attached to the instant Motion. Entered by District Judge Jonathan E Hawley on 4/21/2025. (KZ) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 4/25/2025.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
10 10 OBJECTION TO THE DECLARATION OF JAMES BOURZAK to8 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion/Petition, by Lytx Inc. (Stevanovich, Sophia) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 4/25/2025.]
Related: [-]
9 9 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of its Motion to Transfer Venue by Defendant Lytx Inc. Responses due by 5/1/2025(Stevanovich, Sophia) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 4/25/2025.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Thursday, April 10, 2025
8 8 5 pgs MEMORANDUM in Opposition re5 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Plaintiff ELM One Call Locators, Inc.(Zabek, Samuel) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 4/25/2025.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Declaration of James Bourzak in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion to Transfer Venue
Thursday, March 27, 2025
7 7 Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Lytx Inc. (Stevanovich, Sophia) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 4/25/2025.]
Related: [-]
6 6 10 pgs MEMORANDUM in Support re5 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Defendant Lytx Inc.(Stevanovich, Sophia) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 4/25/2025.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
5 5 MOTION to Transfer Case by Defendant Lytx Inc. Responses due by 4/10/2025 (Stevanovich, Sophia) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 4/25/2025.]
Related: [-]
4 4 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Sophia Stevanovich on behalf of Lytx Inc (Stevanovich, Sophia) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 4/25/2025.]
Related: [-]
3 3 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Kingshuk Roy on behalf of Lytx Inc (Roy, Kingshuk) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 4/25/2025.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
2 2 Summons Issued as to Lytx Inc. Original summons returned to plaintiffs' counsel to effect service. (SB) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 4/25/2025.]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against ELM One Call Locators, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AILCDC-4686092.), filed by ELM One Call Locators, Inc..(Zabek, Samuel) (SB). [Transferred from Illinois Central on 4/25/2025.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (3/6/2025) Civil Cover Sheet